Global Patent Index - EP 1042641 A1

EP 1042641 A1 2000-10-11 - HEAT EXCHANGER TUBULAR BLOCK AND A MULTI-CHAMBER FLAT TUBE WHICH CAN BE USED THEREFOR

Title (en)

HEAT EXCHANGER TUBULAR BLOCK AND A MULTI-CHAMBER FLAT TUBE WHICH CAN BE USED THEREFOR

Title (de)

WÄRMEÜBERTRAGENDER ROHRBLOCK UND DAFÜR VERWENDBARES MEHRKAMMER-FLACHROHR

Title (fr)

BLOC TUBULAIRE D'ECHANGEUR THERMIQUE ET TUBE PLAT MULTICHAMBRE UTILISABLE A CET EFFET

Publication

EP 1042641 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99945950 A

Priority

  • DE 9902128 W
  • DE 19833845 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19833845A1] The invention relates to a heat exchanger tubular block (1) comprising a plurality of block units arranged one behind the other in a direction of the block depth. Said block units each comprise a plurality of heat exchanger tubular units (2) which are successively arranged in a direction of the block height, which comprise tubular channels running in a transversal direction of the block, and which have laterally arranged collection channels (8a-11b) belonging thereto that run in a direction of the block height. According to the invention, at least one collection channel connection (13a, 13b, 13c) is provided between at least two adjacent block units (1). Said collection channel connection directly connects a collection channel of one block unit to a collection channel of the other block unit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 9/26; F28D 1/053; F28F 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28F 1/32 (2006.01); F28D 1/053 (2006.01); F28F 1/02 (2006.01); F28F 9/02 (2006.01); F28F 9/22 (2006.01); F28F 9/26 (2006.01); F28F 27/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 9/262 (2013.01); F28D 1/05391 (2013.01); F28F 1/025 (2013.01); F28F 9/0212 (2013.01); F28F 2250/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0006964A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19833845 A1 20000203; AU 5849499 A 20000221; EP 1042641 A1 20001011; EP 1042641 B1 20030910; JP 2002521644 A 20020716; US 6523606 B1 20030225; WO 0006964 A1 20000210

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080709

2009-03-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080709

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070720

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-07-20 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060720

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-09-24 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2004-09-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040614

2004-04-21 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2004-01-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20031217

2003-12-21 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031221

2003-12-10 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031210

2003-10-29 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2003-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT SE

2003-09-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-09-10 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030910

2003-09-10 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030910

2001-04-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010301

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000810

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE