Global Patent Index - EP 1042674 A1

EP 1042674 A1 2000-10-11 - 148 HUMAN SECRETED PROTEINS

Title (en)

148 HUMAN SECRETED PROTEINS

Title (de)

148 MENSCHLICHE SEKRETIERTE PROTEINE

Title (fr)

148 PROTEINES HUMAINES SECRETEES

Publication

EP 1042674 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98956146 A

Priority

  • US 9822376 W
  • US 6309997 P
  • US 6308897 P
  • US 6310097 P
  • US 6338797 P
  • US 6314897 P
  • US 6338697 P
  • US 6278497 P
  • US 6309197 P
  • US 6309097 P
  • US 6308997 P
  • US 6309297 P
  • US 6311197 P
  • US 6310197 P
  • US 6310997 P
  • US 6311097 P
  • US 6309897 P
  • US 6309797 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9922243A1] The present invention relates to novel human secreted proteins and isolated nucleic acids containing the coding regions of the genes encoding such proteins. Also provided are vectors, host cells, antibodies, and recombinant methods for producing human secreted proteins. The invention further relates to diagnostic and therapeutic methods useful for diagnosing and treating disorders related to these novel human secreted proteins.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01N 33/68; A61K 38/16; A61K 38/17; C07K 16/00; C12N 15/00; C12N 15/11; C12N 15/12; C12N 15/63; C12P 21/02; G01N 33/53

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/53 (2006.01); A61K 31/711 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61P 1/04 (2006.01); A61P 3/10 (2006.01); A61P 5/00 (2006.01); A61P 5/14 (2006.01); A61P 5/18 (2006.01); A61P 7/06 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/02 (2006.01); A61P 11/06 (2006.01); A61P 15/00 (2006.01); A61P 15/08 (2006.01); A61P 15/10 (2006.01); A61P 17/02 (2006.01); A61P 19/02 (2006.01); A61P 25/00 (2006.01); A61P 25/14 (2006.01); A61P 25/16 (2006.01); A61P 25/18 (2006.01); A61P 25/28 (2006.01); A61P 29/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/00 (2006.01); A61P 35/02 (2006.01); A61P 37/00 (2006.01); A61P 37/06 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 16/18 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/09 (2006.01); C12P 21/02 (2006.01); C12Q 1/68 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/47 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9922243 A1 19990506; AU 1273499 A 19990517; CA 2307320 A1 19990506; EP 1042674 A1 20001011; EP 1042674 A4 20050323; JP 2003521865 A 20030722

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051109

2006-03-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FENG, PING

2006-03-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ROSEN, CRAIG A.

2006-03-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: RUBEN, STEVEN M.

2006-03-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NI, JIAN

2006-03-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WEI, YING-FEI

2006-03-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SOPPET, DANIEL R.

2006-03-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MOORE, PAUL A.

2006-03-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KAYW, HLA

2006-03-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LAFLEUR, DAVID W.

2006-03-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: OLSEN, HENRIK S.

2006-03-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BREWER, LAURIE A.

2006-03-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SHI, YANGGU

2006-03-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: EBNER, REINHARD

2006-03-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: YOUNG, PAUL

2006-03-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GREENE, JOHN M.

2006-03-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FLORENCE, KIMBERLY A.

2006-03-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FLORENCE, CHARLES

2006-03-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: DUAN, D. ROXANNE

2006-03-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: JANAT, FOUAD

2006-03-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ENDRESS, GREGORY A.

2006-03-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CARTER, KENNETH C.

2005-08-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050628

2005-03-23 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20050202

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000522

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE