Global patent index - EP 1042720 A1

EP 1042720 A1 2000-10-11 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CREATING INDEXES IN A RELATIONAL DATABASE CORRESPONDING TO CLASSES IN AN OBJECT-ORIENTED APPLICATION

Title (en)

METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR CREATING INDEXES IN A RELATIONAL DATABASE CORRESPONDING TO CLASSES IN AN OBJECT-ORIENTED APPLICATION

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM ERSTELLEN VON INDIZEN, DIE KLASSEN EINER OBJEKT-ORIENTIERTEN ANWENDUNG ENTSPRECHEN, IN EINER RELATIONALEN DATENBANK

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE CREATION D'INDEX DANS UNE BASE DE DONNEES RELATIONNELLE CORRESPONDANT A DES CLASSES D'UNE APPLICATION ORIENTEE OBJET

Publication

EP 1042720 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98964210 A

Priority

  • US 9827243 W
  • US 6841597 P
  • US 10618898 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9933002A1] An improved object-database mapping tool is provided that generates indexes in a database corresponding to classes in an object-oriented application. Initially, the mapping tool maps each class in an object-oriented application to a table in a database. A user, for example, selects one or more fields to be indexed from one or more classes. The tool determines if the selected fields correspond to the columns in more than one table in the database. If the selected fields correspond to a plurality of tables in the database then the mapping tool generates a plurality of indexes. Alternatively, if the fields correspond to one table in the database then the mapping tool generates a single index.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 9/44 (2006.01); G06F 12/00 (2006.01); G06F 17/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/30607 (2013.01); G06F 9/4435 (2013.01); G06F 17/30321 (2013.01); Y10S 707/954 (2013.01); Y10S 707/955 (2013.01); Y10S 707/99934 (2013.01); Y10S 707/99943 (2013.01); Y10S 707/99944 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9933002A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9933002 A1 19990701; AU 1938999 A 19990712; DE 69804673 D1 20020508; DE 69804673 T2 20021017; EP 1042720 A1 20001011; EP 1042720 B1 20020403; JP 2001527243 A 20011225; US 6374256 B1 20020416

INPADOC legal status

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071221

2008-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080701

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051221

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-08-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20071221

2006-12-20 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061220

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-12-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20061214

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-10-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2005-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050831

2003-12-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031210

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-03-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030106

2002-08-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69804673

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-05-08

2002-04-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-03-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010130

2000-10-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SUN MICROSYSTEMS, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-10-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: NG, TONY CHUN TUNG

2000-10-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: LEARMONT, TIMOTHY R.

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000724

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB