Global Patent Index - EP 1042722 A2

EP 1042722 A2 2000-10-11 - INVENTORY DEVICE

Title (en)

INVENTORY DEVICE

Title (de)

BEVORRATUNGSVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'APPROVISIONNEMENT

Publication

EP 1042722 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 98954328 A

Priority

  • DE 19743752 A
  • EP 9806297 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19743752A1] The refrigerator (11) has a top opening and internally there is a conveyor unit (15) that is motor driven (17). This supports various products (20) that are identified by an optical scanner (21). A touch display screen (22) displays symbols of the various products and these can be selected . The conveyor responds to move the selected item to the top.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06F 17/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25D 25/04 (2006.01); G07F 9/02 (2006.01); G07F 11/58 (2006.01); F25D 29/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 11/58 (2013.01); F25D 25/04 (2013.01); G07F 9/02 (2013.01); F25D 29/00 (2013.01); F25D 2400/361 (2013.01); F25D 2500/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9918528A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19743752 A1 19990408; EP 1042722 A2 20001011; EP 1042722 B1 20010926; ES 2165197 T3 20020301; TR 200000487 T2 20000721; WO 9918528 A2 19990415; WO 9918528 A3 19990624

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091003

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110310

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091002

2011-03-24 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110324

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091002

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091102

2010-07-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100630

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081024

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081021

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081028

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-02-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20081027

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081031

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-05-31 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-10-03 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041003

2003-10-22 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20031022

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-09-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2165197 T3

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-10-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59801600 20011031

2001-10-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010927

2001-09-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010314

2001-02-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 06F 17/60 A, 7F 25D 25/00 B

2000-12-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000502

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE