Global patent index - EP 1042738 A1

EP 1042738 A1 2000-10-11 - METHOD FOR AUTOMATIC DEBITING OF TOLLS FOR VEHICLES

Title (en)

METHOD FOR AUTOMATIC DEBITING OF TOLLS FOR VEHICLES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM AUTOMATISCHEN ABBUCHEN VON MAUTGEBÜHREN FÜR FAHRZEUGE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR DEBITER AUTOMATIQUEMENT DES FRAIS DE PEAGE RELATIFS A DES VEHICULES

Publication

EP 1042738 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98964589 A

Priority

  • SE 9802264 W
  • SE 9704853 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9933027A1] A method for automatic debiting of tolls for vehicles (V1-V4) on traffic routes or in traffic zones, the vehicles being equipped with communication devices (1, 11) for communication (12) with a central unit (C) and a roadside unit (3) at a physical toll (4) station. At least one virtual toll charging station (7) is geographically predetermined in relation to the physical station. The vehicle's communication device comprises also a receiver (8) for a signal supplying GNSS system. A first processor (5) reads the position of the vehicle and detects the entry of the vehicle into a virtual toll charging station by comparing the read vehicle position with the positions of the virtual toll charging stations, which data are stored in the vehicle's memory (6), the communication device announcing, via a digital mobile transmitting network to the central unit, that a toll debit transaction is to be executed. The central unit carries out the toll debiting transaction and returns a receipt of the transaction to the vehicle. On entry to the physical toll station the vehicles communication sends, via a communication link to the roadside unit, the receipt as evidence that the correct toll has been paid.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07B 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07B 15/06 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 15/063 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9933027A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9933027 A1 19990701; AT 301312 T 20050815; AU 1988399 A 19990712; AU 748551 B2 20020606; BR 9813812 A 20001003; BR 9813812 B1 20110906; CN 1146831 C 20040421; CN 1283293 A 20010207; DE 69831096 D1 20050908; DE 69831096 T2 20060413; EP 1042738 A1 20001011; EP 1042738 B1 20050803; ES 2251792 T3 20060501; NO 20003227 A 20000621; NO 20003227 D0 20000621; NO 321129 B1 20060320; SE 510080 C2 19990419; SE 9704853 D0 19971222; SE 9704853 L 19990419

INPADOC legal status

2016-04-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151228

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151222

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151214

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151210

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2006-11-01 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: KAPSCH TRAFFICCOM AB

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT1

2006-07-28 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2006-07-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060504

2006-07-01 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

2006-05-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2251792

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2006-04-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: HEPP, WENGER & RYFFEL AG

2006-04-28 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: KAPSCH TRAFFICCOM AB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2005-11-15 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2005-09-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69831096

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-09-08

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2005-08-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2005-08-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-11-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020919

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000706

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE