Global Patent Index - EP 1042772 A1

EP 1042772 A1 2000-10-11 - ARC EXTINGUISHER FOR SWITCHGEAR

Title (en)

ARC EXTINGUISHER FOR SWITCHGEAR

Title (de)

LICHTBOGENLÖSCHEINRICHTUNG FÜR EIN SCHALTGERÄT

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF EXTINCTEUR D'ARC DESTINE A UN APPAREILLAGE DE CONNEXION

Publication

EP 1042772 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98966208 A

Priority

  • DE 9803650 W
  • DE 19757332 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9933080A1] The arc splitting plates (2) having a filigree design of an arc extinguishing chamber (1) must be mounted and fixed in an operationally reliable manner. For that purpose, the branches or bases (3) of the arc splitting plates (2) are kept apart by spacers (9), in particular by grooves (9), shaped on the outer side of the arcing chamber insert (6).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 9/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 9/362 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9933080A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9933080 A1 19990701; CN 1133187 C 20031231; CN 1273680 A 20001115; DE 19757332 C1 19990722; EP 1042772 A1 20001011; EP 1042772 B1 20020313; US 6288354 B1 20010911

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130102

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130702

2013-10-17 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59803389

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20130702

2013-09-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20130830

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120220

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20111227

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-12-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051211

2003-03-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20021216

2002-08-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-04-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59803389

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-04-18

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-09-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010719

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000417

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT