Global Patent Index - EP 1042816 A4

EP 1042816 A4 2001-01-31 - BROAD-BAND QUANTUM WELL INFRARED PHOTODETECTORS

Title (en)

BROAD-BAND QUANTUM WELL INFRARED PHOTODETECTORS

Title (de)

BREITBANDIGE INFRAROT FOTODETEKTOREN MIT QUANTUMWELL

Title (fr)

PHOTODETECTEURS INFRAROUGE LARGE BANDE A PUITS QUANTIQUE

Publication

EP 1042816 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98959585 A

Priority

  • US 9825047 W
  • US 6680197 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9927583A1] A quantum well (200) can be designed to detect light of a particular wavelength by tailoring the potential depth and width of the well (202). The design produces two energy states (210, 208) in the well (202) separated by the desired photon energy. The GaAs/AlxGa1-xAs material system allows the quantum well shape to be varied over a range wide enough to enable light detection at wavelengths longer than approximately 6 mm. Hence, large bandgap materials such as GaAs/AlxGa1-xAs material has made fabrication of a large focal plane arrays tuned to detect light at wavelengths from 6 to 25 mm possible.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01L 29/06; H01L 27/146; H01L 31/00; H01L 31/0328; H01L 31/0336

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01J 1/44 (2006.01); G01J 5/48 (2006.01); H01L 27/14 (2006.01); H01L 27/146 (2006.01); H01L 31/0264 (2006.01); H01L 31/0352 (2006.01); H01L 31/103 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B82Y 20/00 (2013.01); H01L 27/14649 (2013.01); H01L 31/035236 (2013.01); H01L 31/1035 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [XY] US 5646421 A 19970708 - LIU HUI CHUN [CA]
  • [A] US 5384469 A 19950124 - CHOI KWONG-KIT [US]
  • [A] CLARK A ET AL: "Design and optimisation of Al(x)Ga1-xAs/Al(y)Ga1-yAs multilayer structures for visible wavelength applications", JOURNAL OF CRYSTAL GROWTH,NL,NORTH-HOLLAND PUBLISHING CO. AMSTERDAM, vol. 170, no. 1-4, 1997, pages 424 - 427, XP004087147, ISSN: 0022-0248
  • [XY] TIDROW M Z: "Simplified quantum well infrared photodetectors", PHOTODETECTORS: MATERIALS AND DEVICES II, SAN JOSE, CA, USA, 12-14 FEB. 1997, vol. 2999, Proceedings of the SPIE - The International Society for Optical Engineering, 1997, SPIE-Int. Soc. Opt. Eng, USA, pages 109 - 117, XP000944482, ISSN: 0277-786X
  • [X] GUNAPALA S D ET AL: "15-MUM 128 X 128 GAAS/ALXGA1-XAS QUANTUM WELL INFRARED PHOTODETECTOR FOCAL PLANE ARRAY CAMERA", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON ELECTRON DEVICES,US,IEEE INC. NEW YORK, vol. 44, no. 1, 1997, pages 45 - 50, XP000689001, ISSN: 0018-9383
  • See also references of WO 9927583A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9927583 A1 19990603; AU 1535499 A 19990615; CA 2311629 A1 19990603; CA 2311629 C 20060214; EP 1042816 A1 20001011; EP 1042816 A4 20010131; JP 2001524757 A 20011204; JP 3538143 B2 20040614

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060601

2005-04-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050223

2001-01-31 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20001218

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-01-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01L 29/06 A, 7H 01L 31/0328 B, 7H 01L 31/0336 B, 7H 01L 31/00 B, 7H 01L 27/146 B

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000626

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB