Global Patent Index - EP 1042829 A1

EP 1042829 A1 2000-10-11 - Battery

Title (en)

Battery

Title (de)

Batterie

Title (fr)

Pile

Publication

EP 1042829 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98963897 A

Priority

  • US 9826490 W
  • US 182297 A
  • US 5492898 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9934462A1] A cathode (12) that includes manganese dioxide and relatively small particles of nonsynthetic, nonexpanded graphite is disclosed. The graphite particles can have an average particle size of less than 20 microns. The cathode (12) can be used in an electrochemical cell, such as a battery (10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01M 4/30; H01M 4/62

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01M 2/16 (2006.01); H01M 4/06 (2006.01); H01M 4/24 (2006.01); H01M 4/50 (2010.01); H01M 4/62 (2006.01); H01M 6/06 (2006.01); H01M 6/08 (2006.01); H01M 4/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01M 4/244 (2013.01); H01M 4/50 (2013.01); H01M 4/625 (2013.01); H01M 6/08 (2013.01); H01M 2/162 (2013.01); H01M 2/1666 (2013.01); H01M 2004/028 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9934462 A1 19990708; AR 014204 A1 20010207; AU 1913299 A 19990719; CA 2313790 A1 19990708; CN 1285961 A 20010228; EP 1042829 A1 20001011; EP 1042829 A4 20040714; JP 2002500419 A 20020108; TW 398092 B 20000711

INPADOC legal status


2010-10-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100330

2009-04-29 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: BATTERY

2008-04-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THE GILLETTE COMPANY

2007-07-20 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1032673

2007-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20070305

2004-07-14 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20040603

2004-07-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01M 4/30 A

2004-07-14 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7H 01M 4/62 B

2001-02-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WOODNORTH, DOUGLAS, J.

2001-02-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HARRIS, PETER, B.

2001-02-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TAY, GEORGE, I.

2001-02-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: FARISS, GREGORY, A.

2001-02-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BRYS, BARBARA

2001-02-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: CERVERA, JAMES

2001-02-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HAMILTON, TERRY, L.

2001-02-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HOWARD, MARTIN, W.

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000725

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE