Global Patent Index - EP 1042838 A4

EP 1042838 A4 2001-04-04 - FIRE-RESISTANT GAS GENERATING BATTERY ELECTROLYTES

Title (en)

FIRE-RESISTANT GAS GENERATING BATTERY ELECTROLYTES

Title (de)

ELEKTROLYT FÜR EINE BATTERIE, DIE NICHTBRENNBARES GAS PRODUZIERT

Title (fr)

ELECTROLYTES DE BATTERIE PRODUISANT UN GAZ IGNIFUGEANT

Publication

EP 1042838 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98960601 A

Priority

  • US 9825466 W
  • US 6722697 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9928987A1] A compound that generates a fire-retardant gas upon decomposition has general structure (I) wherein, X is N, C, S, NO, N2, CO, SO; A is substantially any organic moiety including alkyl, aryl, alkoxy, cyclic, fused cyclic, heteroatoms, ketals, acetals or alcohols. B<1> and B<2> are substantially any organic moiety including alkyl, aryl, alkoxy, cyclic, fused cyclic, heteroatoms, ketals, acetals or alcohols, also including oxygen, hydrogen and null; and n is an integer from 0-100. Preferred gases generated thereby include CO, SO2, SO3, NO, N2O, NO2 and N2. It is also preferred that the generated gas assists in formation of a solid electrolyte interface (SEI) between the electrolyte and at least one of the electrodes. It is most preferred that the cell have a conductivity greater than 10<-3> S/cm.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01M 10/40; H01M 6/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01M 10/40 (2006.01); H01M 6/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01M 6/162 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9928987 A1 19990610; AU 1616199 A 19990616; CA 2313027 A1 19990610; EP 1042838 A1 20001011; EP 1042838 A4 20010404; JP 2001525597 A 20011211

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-07 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030701

2001-08-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010713

2001-04-04 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010216

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2001-02-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01M 10/40 A, 7H 01M 6/16 B

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000630

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE GB