Global patent index - EP 1042845 A1

EP 1042845 A1 2000-10-11 - ANTENNA

Title (en)

ANTENNA

Title (de)

ANTENNE

Title (fr)

ANTENNE

Publication

EP 1042845 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99941706 A

Priority

  • FR 9902123 W
  • FR 9811251 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2783115A1] The invention concerns an antenna comprising a first electrically conductive surface (12), a second electrically conductive surface (14) forming a groundplane, parallel to the first, a first electrically conductive powering wire or ribbon (16) connecting a generator/receiver (20) first terminal to the first surface (12) and a second powering wire or ribbon (17) connecting a generator/receiver (20) second terminal to the second surface (14), and at least an electrically conductive wire or ribbon (18, 19) connecting both said surfaces. The invention is characterised in that the two surfaces (12, 14) and either the wire(s) or ribbon(s) (18, 19) connecting them are all coplanar.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01Q 9/04; H01Q 13/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01Q 13/08 (2006.01); H01Q 1/24 (2006.01); H01Q 1/38 (2006.01); H01Q 7/00 (2006.01); H01Q 9/04 (2006.01); H01Q 13/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01Q 9/0407 (2013.01); H01Q 13/106 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0014825A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2783115 A1 20000310; FR 2783115 B1 20001201; AT 298937 T 20050715; AU 5521999 A 20000327; CA 2310125 A1 20000316; CA 2310125 C 20070327; DE 69925985 D1 20050804; DE 69925985 T2 20060511; DK 1042845 T3 20051017; EP 1042845 A1 20001011; EP 1042845 B1 20050629; ES 2243070 T3 20051116; JP 2002524953 A 20020806; JP 4364439 B2 20091118; US 6300908 B1 20011009; WO 0014825 A1 20000316; WO 0014825 A9 20000713

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160825

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160823

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160823

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160826

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160824

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-09-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160824

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150821

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150820

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150824

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150914

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-05-01 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

2008-03-03 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLS

- Effective date: 20071207

2008-03-03 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: L' UNIVERSITE DE LIMOGES

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLS

- Effective date: 20071207

2007-12-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE *CNRS

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECA

- Effective date: 20050629

2007-12-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: *UNIVERSITE DE LIMOGES3 RUE MECHEL ANGE, FR-75794

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECA

- Effective date: 20050629

2007-12-31 [BECA] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S ADDRESS

- Owner name: 33 RUE FRANçOIS MITTERAND, F-8700 LIMOGES

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECA

- Effective date: 20050629

2007-12-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE *CNRS

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECH

- Effective date: 20050629

2007-12-31 [BECH] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER

- Owner name: *UNIVERSITE DE LIMOGES

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECH

- Effective date: 20050629

2007-01-19 [REG FR TQ] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TQ

2006-11-08 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2006-06-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060330

2006-05-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2006-01-25 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2005-12-07 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20051207

2005-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2243070

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2005-11-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20051010

2005-10-17 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2005-10-11 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2005-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-09-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050929

2005-09-07 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050907

2005-08-10 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: FRENCH

2005-08-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69925985

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-08-04

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2005-06-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2005-06-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-06-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050629

2005-06-29 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050629

2005-06-29 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050629

2004-11-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CENTRE NATIONAL DELA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-11-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000904

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE