Global Patent Index - EP 1042897 A1

EP 1042897 A1 2000-10-11 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR QUICKLY SELECTING TEXT FROM A LIST USING A NUMERIC TELEPHONE KEYPAD

Title (en)

DEVICE AND METHOD FOR QUICKLY SELECTING TEXT FROM A LIST USING A NUMERIC TELEPHONE KEYPAD

Title (de)

EINRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR SCHNELLEN TEXTAUSWAHL AUS EINER LISTE MITTELS EINER NUMERISCHEN TELEFONTASTATUR

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE POUR LA SELECTION RAPIDE DE TEXTE DANS UNE LISTE AU MOYEN D'UN CLAVIER NUMERIQUE DE TELEPHONE

Publication

EP 1042897 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99971186 A

Priority

  • DE 19849460 A
  • EP 9908050 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19849460A1] The aim of the invention is to provide a device and a method for selecting text from an electronic memory using a numeric telephone keypad. To this end, a digital telephone keypad has at least one pressure sensor sensing the pressure exerted on one or more keys, control electronics processing an input via key confirmation and a text display. The pressure exerted on the keys of the digital telephone keypad is detected and measured for every key by a pressure sensor. The respective pressure value is transmitted to and processed by control electronics. The measured pressure value is shown on a display for every key. The pressure value exerted is changed for the key pressed, if necessary, and once the correct pressure value is reached and shown on the display, the pressure value for every pressed key and information on the selected key are transmitted for further processing of the measured values.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04M 1/23; H04M 1/247; H04M 1/274

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 3/02 (2006.01); H03M 11/10 (2006.01); H04M 1/00 (2006.01); H04M 1/02 (2006.01); H04M 1/23 (2006.01); H04M 1/247 (2006.01); H04M 1/2745 (2006.01); H04M 1/725 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04M 1/274558 (2013.01); G06F 3/0202 (2013.01); G06F 3/0233 (2013.01); H03M 11/10 (2013.01); H04M 1/23 (2013.01); H04M 1/274525 (2013.01); H04M 1/72519 (2013.01); H04M 1/72583 (2013.01); H04M 2250/12 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0025500A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19849460 A1 20000504; DE 19849460 B4 20091105; EP 1042897 A1 20001011; JP 2002528831 A 20020903; JP 4854852 B2 20120118; US 6735307 B1 20040511; WO 0025500 A1 20000504

INPADOC legal status


2014-10-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140415

2014-01-01 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20131203

2006-08-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041228

2005-12-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOELCKERS, OLIVER

2005-12-28 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: VOELCKERS, OLIVER

2005-02-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041228

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000718

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE