Global Patent Index - EP 1042908 A1

EP 1042908 A1 2000-10-11 - METHOD FOR CONNECTING A REMOTELY POWERED PERIPHERAL UNIT

Title (en)

METHOD FOR CONNECTING A REMOTELY POWERED PERIPHERAL UNIT

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM ANSCHLIESSEN EINES FERNGESPEISTEN, PERIPHEREN GERÄTS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR RACCORDER UN APPAREIL PERIPHERIQUE ALIMENTE A DISTANCE

Publication

EP 1042908 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98960857 A

Priority

  • AT 9800317 W
  • AT 218397 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9934591A1] The invention relates to a method for connecting a peripheral unit to an information transmission system. Said unit is remotely powered by a central location via a transmission line. In a first step, the peripheral unit is connected to the transmission line with a remote power voltage. In a second step, a test voltage which is smaller than the remote power voltage of the unit, said remote power voltage being provided for the operation, is applied to the central location end of the transmission line, and the connection state pertaining to the peripheral ends of the transmission line is established by a measurement of the quantity of electricity flowing in the transmission line which is conducted at the central location end. In a third step, the remote power voltage is increased on the operating remote voltage when the correct connection state of the transmission line is established.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04M 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04M 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04M 19/001 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9934591A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9934591 A1 19990708; AT 407321 B 20010226; AT A218397 A 20000615; AU 1646699 A 19990719; EP 1042908 A1 20001011; HU 0100695 A2 20010628; HU 0100695 A3 20020228; IL 136837 A 20041215; IL 136837 D0 20010614; SI 20296 A 20001231

INPADOC legal status


2008-08-01 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1036895

2006-07-12 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20060119

2004-06-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: FLEXTRONICS INTERNATIONAL GMBH & CO. NFG. KG

2001-01-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ERICSSON AHEAD COMMUNICATIONS SYSTEMS GMBH

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000724

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB