Global Patent Index - EP 1042967 A1

EP 1042967 A1 2000-10-11 - Footwear

Title (en)

Footwear

Title (de)

Schuhwerk

Title (fr)

Article chaussant

Publication

EP 1042967 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00301596 A

Priority

US 28905599 A

Abstract (en)

A slipper (10) with a durable outsole (20), and a separable resilient insert (38) placed on top of the outsole. The slipper preferably includes an insole (62) covering the separate resilient insert, and a vamp (12) attached to the outsole. When in use, the durable outsole is resistant to wear and abrasion, and the separate resilient insert provides comfort to the user's foot because the resilient insert is separate from and movable relative to the outsole when a user walks in the slipper. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 3/10; A43B 17/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 3/10 (2006.01); A43B 17/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 7/142 (2013.01); A43B 3/108 (2013.01); A43B 7/143 (2013.01); A43B 7/145 (2013.01); A43B 17/02 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1042967 A1 20001011

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030617

2003-03-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030205

2001-08-30 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-07-25 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): GB

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE CH DE ES FR GB LI

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001128

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): GB

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI