Global Patent Index - EP 1042970 A2

EP 1042970 A2 2000-10-11 - Double frame fastening device and belt using such a buckle

Title (en)

Double frame fastening device and belt using such a buckle

Title (de)

Doppelrahmen-Verschluss und Gurt mit einem solchen Verschluss

Title (fr)

Boucle à double cadre et sangle utilisant une telle boucle

Publication

EP 1042970 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00106923 A

Priority

DE 29906048 U

Abstract (en)

The buckle (30) has upper and lower frames (20,10) which are each formed by two side elements (21,11) and front and rear elements (22,23;12,13). The frames are constructed in such a way that they are unable to move with respect to one another in a certain direction once the buckle closes.

Abstract (de)

Der Doppelrahmen-Verschluß zum Schließen von Gurten (30) hat einen unteren und einen oberen Rahmen (10, 20), die jeweils aus zwei seitlichen Seitenelemente und einem vorderen und einem hinteren Seitenelement (12, 13; 22, 23) gebildet sind. Die Rahmen (10, 20) sind so ausgebildet, daß sie sich bei geschlossenem Verschluß in einer Richtung nicht gegeneinander verschieben können. Dazu kann an der Hinterkante des hinteren Seitenelements des unteren Rahmens (10) eine Winkelkante vorgesehen sein, an der der obere Rahmen (20) bei geschlossenem Verschluß anliegt. Der obere Rahmen (20) ist etwas kürzer als der untere Rahmen (10), wobei das vordere Seitenelement (22) des oberen Rahmens (20) nur etwa die halbe Breite des vorderen Seitenelements (12) des unteren Rahmens (10) überlappt. Das vordere Seitenelement (22) des oberen Rahmens (20) hat ein sich nach vorne verjüngendes Profil. Die hinteren Seitenelemente (13, 14) liegen in einer Schlaufe (32) am einen Ende des Gurtes (30). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A44B 11/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44B 11/18 (2006.01); A62B 1/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44B 11/18 (2013.01); A62B 1/18 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29906048 U1 19990909; EP 1042970 A2 20001011; EP 1042970 A3 20010321

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021001

2002-04-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CHRISTIAN DALLOZ HOLDING DEUTSCHLAND GMBH & CO. KG

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010906

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI