Global Patent Index - EP 1042970 A3

EP 1042970 A3 2001-03-21 - Double frame fastening device and belt using such a buckle

Title (en)

Double frame fastening device and belt using such a buckle

Title (de)

Doppelrahmen-Verschluss und Gurt mit einem solchen Verschluss

Title (fr)

Boucle à double cadre et sangle utilisant une telle boucle

Publication

EP 1042970 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00106923 A

Priority

DE 29906048 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1042970A2] The buckle (30) has upper and lower frames (20,10) which are each formed by two side elements (21,11) and front and rear elements (22,23;12,13). The frames are constructed in such a way that they are unable to move with respect to one another in a certain direction once the buckle closes.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A44B 11/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44B 11/18 (2006.01); A62B 1/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44B 11/18 (2013.01); A62B 1/18 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29906048 U1 19990909; EP 1042970 A2 20001011; EP 1042970 A3 20010321

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021001

2002-04-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CHRISTIAN DALLOZ HOLDING DEUTSCHLAND GMBH & CO. KG

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-11-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010906

2001-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI