Global patent index - EP 1042973 A1

EP 1042973 A1 2000-10-11 - Sunshade and device to assist for opening and closing

Title (en)

Sunshade and device to assist for opening and closing

Title (de)

Sonnenschirm und Hilfsvorrichtung zum Öffnen und Schliessen

Title (fr)

Parasol et son dispositif d'aide au déploiement et reploiement

Publication

EP 1042973 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00410029 A

Priority

FR 9904495 A

Abstract (en)

The sunshade consists of a covered frame (35) which is opened when in use and deployed to one side of a static mast (2) by a cantilevered arm (3) which is retracted against the mast when not in use. The arm is deployed by sliding through a bracket (4) pivoted to the top of the mast, and is actuated by a lever (6) pivoted to the arm and mast, and a power cylinder (8), e.g. pneumatic or hydraulic, connected to the lever.

Abstract (fr)

Parasol (1) du type comportant un mât principal (2) et un bras radial secondaire mobile en déplacement par rapport au mât principal entre une position inactive repliée et une position active déployée (B), caractérisé en ce qu'il comprend un dispositif d'aide au déploiement et/ou au reploiement (DA) destiné à exercer une force de manière à entraîner en déplacement le bras secondaire vers sa position repliée et/ou déployée (B). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45B 23/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45B 23/00 (2006.01); A45B 25/00 (2006.01); A45B 25/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45B 25/006 (2013.01); A45B 23/00 (2013.01); A45B 25/16 (2013.01); A45B 2023/0012 (2013.01); A45B 2023/0037 (2013.01); A45B 2023/0043 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1042973 A1 20001011; FR 2792022 A1 20001013; FR 2792022 B1 20010622

INPADOC legal status

2005-12-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20050614

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010611

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010321

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI