Global Patent Index - EP 1043008 A1

EP 1043008 A1 2000-10-11 - Clapping method and system

Title (en)

Clapping method and system

Title (de)

Klopfvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de battage

Publication

EP 1043008 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99203085 A

Priority

IL 12922499 A

Abstract (en)

A system for providing clapping therapy, which includes a clapper device (20) having at least one clapper element (24) mounted onto a first elongate support (28); and drive apparatus (41) for selectably imparting to each the clapper element, via the first elongate support (28), a predetermined reciprocating motion, thereby to bring each clapper element into force transfer contact with a portion of a patient, so as to periodically apply a clapping stroke thereto in clapping therapy of the patient. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61H 23/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61H 23/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61H 23/006 (2013.01); A61H 9/0057 (2013.01); A61H 2201/1215 (2013.01); A61H 2201/1418 (2013.01); A61H 2201/1623 (2013.01); A61H 2201/1678 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1043008 A1 20001011; IL 129224 D0 20000217

INPADOC legal status


2002-06-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010411

2002-03-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-01-30 [DBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (DELETED)

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI