Global Patent Index - EP 1043041 A1

EP 1043041 A1 2000-10-11 - GUIDING DEVICE OF INSTRUMENTS

Title (en)

GUIDING DEVICE OF INSTRUMENTS

Title (de)

FÜHRUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR INSTRUMENTE

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE GUIDAGE D'INSTRUMENTS

Publication

EP 1043041 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98950453 A

Priority

JP 9804909 W

Abstract (en)

A device for guiding a branched artificial blood vessel 1 having a tubular main body 5 with collapsible/restorable elasticity and a branch portion 6 with collapsible/restorable elasticity which branches from a part of the main body 5 with its internal space communicating with the main body 5, which artificial blood vessel 1 has been transferred as collapsed in a main blood vessel 2 to a branched part 4 branching a branch blood vessel 3 from the main blood vessel 2, the device being utilized in inserting the branch portion 6 of the artificial blood vessel 1 into the branch blood vessel 3, the device comprising an operating rod 9a inserted into the main body 5 from a trailing open end thereof and operable for rotation by hand, a guiding rod 9b continuously connected to the operating rod 9a so as to be capable of turning around with rotation of the operating rod 9a and having a leading end extending to an open end of the branch portion, and mooring means 9c for releasably mooring the branch portion by a portion adjacent the open end thereof to the guiding rod 9b, wherein when the main body is moved backward with the guiding rod 9b made to assume a predetermined position by turning, the branch portion 6 accompanying the guiding rod 9b is capable of advancing into the branch blood vessel 3 together with the guiding rod 9b. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61M 25/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61F 2/954 (2013.01); A61M 25/09 (2006.01); A61M 29/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61F 2/954 (2013.01); A61F 2/07 (2013.01); A61F 2/89 (2013.01); A61F 2/962 (2013.01); A61F 2002/061 (2013.01); A61F 2002/065 (2013.01); A61F 2002/9511 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0025847 A1 20000511; EP 1043041 A1 20001011; EP 1043041 A4 20081217; JP 4342734 B2 20091014; US 6537284 B1 20030325

INPADOC legal status


2012-08-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120307

2009-08-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090716

2008-12-17 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20081114

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001025

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT