Global patent index - EP 1043044 A2

EP 1043044 A2 2000-10-11 - Method and apparatus for extinguishing forest fires from the air

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for extinguishing forest fires from the air

Title (de)

Verfahren und Gerät zum Löschen von Waldbränden aus der Luft

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil pour l'extinction d'incendies de forêts par voie aérienne

Publication

EP 1043044 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00107366 A

Priority

DE 19915840 A

Abstract (en)

A device for fighting forest fires uses containers (1) filled with extinguishing substances that can be thrown from aircraft These have a charge of explosives (3) for using an explosive-type charge to release these extinguishing substances at a chosen height from the ground. Each container has a brake and control drogue (2).

Abstract (de)

Gerät zur Bekämpfung von Waldbränden und dergleichen mit Hilfe von aus einem Fluggerät abwerfbaren, mit Löschmittel gefüllten Behältern (1) mit einer Sprengladung (3) zum explosionsartigen Ausbringen des Löschmittels in einem gewählten Höhenabstand vom Boden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A62C 3/02; A62C 19/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A62C 3/02 (2006.01); A62C 19/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A62C 3/025 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1043044 A2 20001011; EP 1043044 A3 20011031; DE 19915840 A1 20001012

INPADOC legal status

2003-01-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020503

2002-08-22 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-07-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-10-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-10-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI