Global patent index - EP 1043077 A2

EP 1043077 A2 2000-10-11 - Adjustment screw for pop-up underground sprinkler nozzle

Title (en)

Adjustment screw for pop-up underground sprinkler nozzle

Title (de)

Einstellschraube für Versenkregner

Title (fr)

Vis de réglage pour arroseur escamotable

Publication

EP 1043077 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00201226 A

Priority

IT MI990192 U

Abstract (en)

An adjustment screw (1) for pop-up underground sprinkler nozzle, comprises a head (2) and a threaded shank (3). On the top of the head (2) and at the opposite end of the threaded shank (3) there are provided axially lined up cavities (4, 5) that are engageable with a same setscrew wrench for the fixing and, respectively, the adjustment of the screw inside the nozzle (7). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B05B 15/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B05B 1/30 (2006.01); B05B 15/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B05B 1/304 (2013.01); B05B 15/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1043077 A2 20001011; EP 1043077 A3 20030813; AU 2522500 A 20001012; IL 135418 D0 20010520; IT 246625 Y1 20020409; IT MI990192 U1 20001009; IT MI990192 V0 19990407

INPADOC legal status

2004-11-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040214

2004-06-09 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2004-05-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2003-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-08-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-08-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 05B 15/10 A

2003-08-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 05B 15/00 B

2003-08-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 05B 1/30 B

2003-08-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 05B 1/26 B

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI