Global patent index - EP 1043086 A2

EP 1043086 A2 2000-10-11 - Strip guiding device

Title (en)

Strip guiding device

Title (de)

Bandführung

Title (fr)

Guide de bande

Publication

EP 1043086 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00302724 A

Priority

JP 9539699 A

Abstract (en)

A strip guiding device (1) for guiding a strip (W) longitudinally along a feed path has a limiting mechanism (4) for limiting the strip transversely at opposite side edges thereof to cause the strip to pass through a predetermined position in the feed path. The limiting mechanism (4) has a pair of abutment members (5,6) having respective abutment surfaces (10) for abutting against the side edges of the strip (W) along the feed path. The abutment members (5,6) are movable in first directions toward and away from the side edges of the strip, and normally urged by a spring assembly (12) to move away from the strip. The limiting mechanism also has a pair of pressing members (7,8) having respective slanted surfaces (16) held in sliding contact with respective sliding surfaces (11) of the abutment members (5,6) remote from the abutment surfaces. The pressing members (7,8) are movable in second directions transverse to the first directions. The pressing members (7,8) press the abutment members (5,6) toward the strip (W) against the urging means (12) by sliding contact of the slanted surfaces (16) with the sliding surfaces (11) in response to movement of the pressing members (7,8) in one of the second directions. The limiting mechanism further includes a displacing mechanism (22) for displacing the pressing members in the second directions to move the abutment members in the first directions. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21C 47/00; B21D 43/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 28/04 (2006.01); B21C 47/34 (2006.01); B21D 43/00 (2006.01); B21D 43/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 43/023 (2013.01); B21C 47/34 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1043086 A2 20001011; EP 1043086 A3 20010926; EP 1043086 B1 20040526; DE 60010965 D1 20040701; DE 60010965 T2 20041021; JP 2000288662 A 20001017; JP 3688509 B2 20050831; US 6290170 B1 20010918

INPADOC legal status

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2011-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2010-10-13 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20101001

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090327

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-05-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090303

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-12-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20081125

2008-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070308

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-03-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070328

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-05-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050301

2005-01-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-07-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60010965

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-07-01

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2004-05-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-06-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB NL

2002-05-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020318

2001-09-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-09-26 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 21C 47/00 A, 7B 21D 43/02 B, 7B 21C 47/34 B

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB NL

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI