Global patent index - EP 1043092 A1

EP 1043092 A1 2000-10-11 - Method for assembling two parts, parts and assembling made by this method

Title (en)

Method for assembling two parts, parts and assembling made by this method

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Verbinden zweier Werkstücke, Werkstücke und Verbindung Hergesteld bei diesem Verfahren

Title (fr)

Procédé d'assemblage de deux pièces, pièces destinées à être assemblées grâce à ce procédé et assemblage de deux telles pièces

Publication

EP 1043092 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00420070 A

Priority

FR 9904611 A

Abstract (en)

The method of assembling metal tubes (10,20) in a cryogen circuit involves machining one tube to form a ferrule (16) of hard metal. A second piece is formed into a receiving sleeve (24) of softer metal. It involves plastically deforming (F4) the sleeve a thread (F2). The sleeve is pressed against a frusto-conical section (14a) of the ferrule.

Abstract (fr)

Procédé d'assemblage de deux pièces (10, 20), notamment tubulaires, une première pièce (10) usinée en forme d'embout (16) étant réalisée dans un métal relativement dur, une seconde pièce (20) formant manchon (24) de réception dudit embout (16) étant réalisée dans un métal relativement malléable, lesdites deux pièces (10, 20) présentant un axe géométrique commun d'assemblage (X-X'), caractérisé en ce qu'il consiste à déformer (F4) plastiquement, par filage (F3), ledit manchon (24) en direction dudit axe (X-X'), en pressant ledit manchon (24) contre au moins une section tronconique externe (14a) dudit embout (16), divergente en direction d'un bord avant (15) dudit embout (16). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 39/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 39/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 39/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1043092 A1 20001011; EP 1043092 B1 20030625; DE 60003483 D1 20030731; FR 2791914 A1 20001013; FR 2791914 B1 20010608

INPADOC legal status

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060502

2007-03-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20061230

2006-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2006-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2006-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060430

2005-05-13 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050513

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050428

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-11-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-04-06 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040406

2003-09-26 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030926

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60003483

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-07-31

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-07-16 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2003-06-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-25 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030625

2002-03-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: PINET, ARMAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001230

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI