Global Patent Index - EP 1043116 A2

EP 1043116 A2 2000-10-11 - Clamping device for components

Title (en)

Clamping device for components

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Spannen von Bauteilen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de serrage pour composants

Publication

EP 1043116 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00106558 A

Priority

AT 58099 A

Abstract (en)

The modular device has a projecting middle part (3) in two part, with upper and lower part elements (12, 13), each with a fl connecting surface, connected to each other by means of a plan-parallel plate (14) of standard thickness so that they can be separated. The plate also connects a holding element (17) of the head part to the middle part.

Abstract (de)

Gezeigt wird eine einfache und flexible modulare Vorrichtung zum Spannen und/oder Halten und/oder Bearbeiten von Bauteilen bei der Montage von Karosserien bei der Automobilfertigung, mit einer Montageplatte (6), an welcher zumindest ein Fußteil (2) befestigbar ist, an welchem ein aufragender Mittelteil (3) befestigbar ist, welcher einen justierbaren Kopfteil (4) trägt. Erfindungsgemäß ist der aufragende Mittelteil (3) zweiteilig ausgebildet und weist ein oberes und ein unteres Teilelement (12, 13) mit je einer ebenen Verbindungsfläche auf, welche über zumindest eine planparallele Platte (14) genormter Dicke lösbar miteinander verbunden sind. Weiters sind ein Halteelement (17) des Kopfteils 4) und/oder ein betätigbares Spannelement (18) des Kopfteils (4) über zumindest je zwei planparallele Platten (14) genormter Dicke so mit dem Mittelteil (3) lösbar verbunden, daß sich eine Justierung des Kopfteils (4) in alle drei Richtungen ergibt. Diese Justierung kann herstellerseitig vorbereitet und kundenseitig rasch vorgenommen, dokumentiert und problemlos geändert werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B23Q 3/10; B25B 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B25B 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25B 5/006 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 1043116 A2 20001011; EP 1043116 A3 20030625; EP 1043116 B1 20050810; AT 409356 B 20020725; AT A58099 A 20011215; DE 50010899 D1 20050915; ES 2245626 T3 20060116

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150328

2016-04-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20160426

2016-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150327

2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150331

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151001

2016-01-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151130

2015-11-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 301528 T

- Effective date: 20150327

2015-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 50010899

2014-11-15 [REG AT HC] CHANGE OF THE FIRM NAME OR FIRM ADDRESS

- Owner name: TMS TURNKEY MANUFACTURING SOLUTIONS GMBH, AT

- Document: AT 301528 T

- Effective date: 20141002

2014-11-14 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: TMS TURNKEY MANUFACTURING SOLUTIONS GMBH, AT

- Effective date: 20141016

2014-11-14 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: TMS TURNKEY MANUFACTURING SOLUTIONS GMBH, AT

- Effective date: 20141016

2014-09-19 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Owner name: TMS TURNKEY MANUFACTURING SOLUTIONS GMBH

- Effective date: 20140915

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140328

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-08-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20140428

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-08-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: TMS TURNKEY MANUFACTURING SOLUTIONS GMBH, AT

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: TMS PRODUKTIONSSYSTEME GMBH, LINZ, AT

- Document: DE 50010899

- Effective date: 20140709

2014-05-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140326

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140328

- Year of fee payment: 15

2006-07-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060511

2006-05-17 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: TMS TRANSPORT- UND MONTAGESYSTEME GMBH

2006-04-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2245626 T3

2005-09-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50010899 P 20050915

2005-08-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR

2004-03-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR

2003-11-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030929

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-06-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 23Q 3/10 A

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 25B 5/00 B

2003-06-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7B 23Q 3/18 B

2003-03-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TMS PRODUKTIONSSYSTEME GMBH

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI