Global patent index - EP 1043128 A1

EP 1043128 A1 2000-10-11 - Knife with an essentially hollow handle for holding and guiding a slider

Title (en)

Knife with an essentially hollow handle for holding and guiding a slider

Title (de)

Messer mit einem im wesentlichen hohlen Griffkörper zur Aufnahme und Führung eines Schiebers

Title (fr)

Couteau avec manche essentiellement creux pour retenir et guider un coulisseau

Publication

EP 1043128 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00106180 A

Priority

DE 19915934 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19915934C1] The hand knife has a grip (11) to receive a retractable blade (21). The cover (23) and blade holding (22) sections are relatively movable in two parallel planes. The sections cooperate to hold the blade sleeve (20) for movement through a slit (41) out of the grip (11) into an extended position.

Abstract (de)

Ein Messer (10) mit einem im wesentlichen hohlen Griffkörper (11) nimmt einen Schieber (21) auf und führt diesen, welcher ein Aufnahmeteil (22) und ein Abdeckteil (23) aufweist und eine Messerklinge (20) zwischen diesen beiden Teilen (22, 23) hält. Abdeckteil (23) und Aufnahmeteil (22) sind in zwei einander parallelen Ebenen relativ beweglich zueinander. Das vom Abdeckteil (23) entriegelte Aufnahmeteil (22) ist gemeinsam mit der vom Aufnahmeteil (22) gehaltenen Messerklinge (20) durch einen Entnahmeschlitz (41) hindurch aus dem Griffkörper (11) heraus in eine Entnahmeposition der Messerklinge (20) nach außen führbar. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26B 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26B 1/08 (2006.01); B26B 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26B 5/003 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19915934 C1 19991209; EP 1043128 A1 20001011; EP 1043128 B1 20020828; ES 2181619 T3 20030301; US 6550144 B1 20030422

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160318

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160128

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-03-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 16

2012-02-23 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R084

- Ref Document Number: 50000404

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20111216

2004-10-01 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2004-08-02 [NLT1] NL: MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES REGISTERED IN VIRTUE OF DOCUMENTS PRESENTED TO THE PATENT OFFICE PURSUANT TO ART. 16 A, PARAGRAPH 1

- Owner name: MARTOR KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLT1

2003-08-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030530

2003-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2181619

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-11-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50000404

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-10-02

2002-09-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020828

2002-08-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2002-08-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-03-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE DK ES FR GB IT NL

2001-04-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010228

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000727

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI