Global Patent Index - EP 1043157 A2

EP 1043157 A2 2000-10-11 - An integrated system for evaluating the residual solvent contained in packaging films during the printing process at the manufacturing plants

Title (en)

An integrated system for evaluating the residual solvent contained in packaging films during the printing process at the manufacturing plants

Title (de)

Ein integriertes System für das Auswerten des Restlösungsmittels enthalten in Verpackungsfilmen während des Druckprozesses in den Produktionsanlagen

Title (fr)

Un système intégré pour évaluer le dissolvant résiduel contenu en films d' empaquetage pendant le processus d' impression aux usines

Publication

EP 1043157 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 00106883 A

Priority

IT TO990262 A

Abstract (en)

An integrated system for evaluating the residual solvent in packaging films during the printing process at the manufacturing plants, comprising: a device (17) for the automatic on-line taking of the sample (19) to be analysed; a single analyser (21) that embodies the functions of three laboratory instruments: headspace or desorption unit, gas chromatograph and data system, with comparable analytical results. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 33/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 33/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1043157 A2 20001011; EP 1043157 A3 20010502; IT 1307238 B1 20011030; IT TO990262 A1 20001002

INPADOC legal status


2002-10-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011103

2002-03-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-01-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-12-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 41F 33/00 A, 7G 01N 1/04 B

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI