Global Patent Index - EP 1043172 A3

EP 1043172 A3 2001-04-04 - Device for turning back the pages in an open file

Title (en)

Device for turning back the pages in an open file

Title (de)

Einrichtung für das Zurücklegen von Blättern in einen geöffneten Aktenordner

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour tourner les feuilles dans un classeur

Publication

EP 1043172 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00810310 A

Priority

CH 67099 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1043172A2] The file cover (1) has a lifting device (13) fitted between the front cover and the turned-over stack part (10'). The liftin device is used to return the turned-over stack part to its original position by means of the closing movement of the front cover (2), so that they are correctly lined up on the aligning pins (9).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B42F 13/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B42F 13/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B42F 13/408 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1043172 A2 20001011; EP 1043172 A3 20010404

INPADOC legal status


2002-09-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20011005

2002-02-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI