Global Patent Index - EP 1043173 A1

EP 1043173 A1 2000-10-11 - Sharpener for soft pencil lead

Title (en)

Sharpener for soft pencil lead

Title (de)

Spitzer für Weichminenstifte

Title (fr)

Taille-crayon pour mine de crayon molle

Publication

EP 1043173 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00101137 A

Priority

DE 19915384 A

Abstract (en)

The sharpener has a guide channel (3) for the stick end in a housing body and on its upper side a sharpening blade (4) for t stick cone to be sharpened. A free space (5) is provided beneath the front sharpening blade end and has a shaping edge (6) for creating the required shape of the stick point. The free space at its front end turned away from the guide channel (3) is closed by a releasably fixed, separate insert par (7), which on its side facing the guide channel supports the shaping edge.

Abstract (de)

Ein Spitzer für Weichstifte enthält einen Minenformer mit einer im Freiraum (5) vor dem Stiftführungskanal positionierten Formkante (6) zur Fassongebung der Minenspitze. Diese Formkante (6) ist Teil eines lösbar fixierten, gesonderten Einsatzteils (7), welches den Freiraum (5) zur Gehäuserückseite (12) hin begrenzt und an seiner dem Führungskanal (3) zugewandten Seite die Formkante (6) trägt. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B43L 23/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B43L 23/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B43L 23/085 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IE IT

EPO simple patent family

US 6301791 B1 20011016; DE 19915384 A1 20001019; EP 1043173 A1 20001011; EP 1043173 B1 20021016

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160126

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-02 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 50000631

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: TERGAU & WALKENHORST PATENTANWAELTE PARTGMBB, DE

2013-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130121

2013-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130131

2013-11-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130121

2013-10-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20130930

2013-09-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20130121

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120126

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-06-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120124

- Year of fee payment: 13

2012-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120201

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-11-02 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM4A

2005-01-21 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050121

2004-01-27 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040127

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-10-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030717

2003-05-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-05-16 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

- Ref Legal Event Code: CA

2003-02-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030203

2003-01-29 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: KUM LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2002-11-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50000631

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-11-21

2002-11-13 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2002-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE IT

2002-10-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-08-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010618

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IE IT

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IE IT

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI