Global Patent Index - EP 1043234 B1

EP 1043234 B1 2003-06-18 - Apparatus and method for separating a film having at least two layers and a packaging machine incorporating such an apparatus

Title (en)

Apparatus and method for separating a film having at least two layers and a packaging machine incorporating such an apparatus

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Trennen einer Folie mit wenigstens zwei Laminatschichten und Verpackungsmaschine mit einer solchen Vorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé pour séparer un film comportant au moins deux couches et machine d'emballage avec un tel dispositif

Publication

EP 1043234 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 00106547 A

Priority

DE 19915040 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1043234A1] A foil has a first and a second layer bonded together. A first device (30,31,41) limits the foil area to be separated by sea it. A second device (100,38) feeds in compressed air. In the packaging process covering foil is made up from two-layer foil bond together. These two layers are separated from each other on the edge of the foil.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65B 61/18; B65B 25/06; B65D 77/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 43/36 (2006.01); B65B 7/16 (2006.01); B65B 7/28 (2006.01); B65B 25/06 (2006.01); B65B 61/18 (2006.01); B65D 77/20 (2006.01); B65D 81/24 (2006.01); B65D 85/50 (2006.01); B65B 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 77/2024 (2013.01); B65B 7/164 (2013.01); B65B 25/065 (2013.01); B65B 25/067 (2013.01); B65B 61/18 (2013.01); B65B 5/068 (2013.01); B65D 2577/2066 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1043234 A1 20001011; EP 1043234 B1 20030618; CA 2302133 A1 20001001; DE 19915040 A1 20001012; ES 2200746 T3 20040316; JP 2000302107 A 20001031; US 6698165 B1 20040302

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080327

2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080328

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080327

2009-05-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080328

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-12-19 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20081125

2008-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080327

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070321

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070605

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-03-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070330

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-03-23 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070323

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-03-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070323

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-06-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040319

2004-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2200746 T3

2004-02-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-05 [REG GB FG4C] CORRECTIONS FOR GRANTED EUROPEAN PATENT

- Free text: NOTIFICATION HAS NOW BEEN RECEIVED FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT OFFICE THAT THE NAME OF THE APPLICANT SHOULD HAVE BEEN RECORDED AS: MULTIVAC SEPP HAGGENMüLLER GMBH & CO. THIS CORRECTION WAS PUBLISHED IN THE EUROPEAN PATENT BULLETIN NO. 03/36 OF 20030903.

2003-09-03 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: MULTIVAC SEPP HAGGENMUELLER GMBH & CO.

2003-07-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50002567 P 20030724

2003-07-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2003-06-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-07-24 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR SEPARATING A FILM HAVING AT LEAST TWO LAYERS AND A PACKAGING MACHINE INCORPORATING SUCH AN APPARATUS

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010606

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010326

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI