Global patent index - EP 1043240 A2

EP 1043240 A2 2000-10-11 - Semi-finished product, space element made of this product, set composed of this space element and a pallet

Title (en)

Semi-finished product, space element made of this product, set composed of this space element and a pallet

Title (de)

Halbprodukt, aus demselben gefertigtes Abstandstück, Einheit aus Abstandstück und Tragplatte

Title (fr)

Produit semi-fini, distanceur obtenu à partir de ce produit, ensemble composé du distanceur et d'une palette

Publication

EP 1043240 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00201078 A

Priority

NL 1011685 A

Abstract (en)

The unit consists of a plate (2) and a spacer made from a semi-finished product (1) of sheet material, the flat surfaces (3, of which are folded along one or more fold lines and connected to each other by rivet or glue joints. The semi-finished product be folded in a single or multiple process to produce a complete spacer ready for use.

Abstract (de)

Aus einer einzigen Flachplatte gefertigtes, hauptsächlich flaches Abstandstück-Halbprodukt (1) aus Plattenmaterial, dessen Flachplatte (3,5) eine oder mehrere Falzlinien entlang gefaltet ist und von dem anschließend einer oder mehrere Teile durch Verbindungsmittel, wie Niete oder Klebemittel, an einander befestigt sind, wobei dieses Halbprodukt mittels eines oder mehrerer Falzvorgänge zu einem für einen direkten Gebrauch geeigneten, formfesten, hüllenförmigen Abstandstück gebildet werden kann. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 19/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 19/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 19/385 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

WO 9418082 A1 19940818 - PRONK MATTHEUS ANTOON JOHAN [NL]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1043240 A2 20001011; EP 1043240 A3 20010627; NL 1011685 C1 20000927

INPADOC legal status

2002-12-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20011228

2002-04-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-03-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-06-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI