Global Patent Index - EP 1043251 A3

EP 1043251 A3 2001-05-16 - Method, device and transport hanger for automatically transferring clothing

Title (en)

Method, device and transport hanger for automatically transferring clothing

Title (de)

Verfahren, Anordnung und Transportbügel zum automatischen Übergeben von Bekleidungsstücken

Title (fr)

Procédé, dispositif et cintre transporteur pour le transfer automatique de cintres

Publication

EP 1043251 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99122935 A

Priority

  • DE 19853699 A
  • DE 19856431 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1043251A2] The portable clothes hanger has two arms (2a,2b) pointing in opposite directions. Clips (8a,8b) for fixing trousers are fixe to, and slide along, the arms at a distance apart corresponding to the width of the trouser-waist. The clips are in two halves under spring pressure. The clips are closed by fasteners consisting of lever ends (3a,3b)swivel mounted on a swivel axis (6a,6b) . Whe the clip is open the end (16a,16b) of the lever is pulled out of a cavity.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65G 47/61; A47G 25/44; D06F 95/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47G 25/40 (2006.01); A47G 25/44 (2006.01); A47G 25/48 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47G 25/403 (2013.01); A47G 25/443 (2013.01); A47G 25/485 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1043251 A2 20001011; EP 1043251 A3 20010516

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-15 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040602

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011116

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 65G 47/61 A, 7A 47G 25/44 B, 7D 06F 95/00 B

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI