Global Patent Index - EP 1043254 A1

EP 1043254 A1 2000-10-11 - Sheet feeder for a collator

Title (en)

Sheet feeder for a collator

Title (de)

Anleger für eine Zusammentragmaschine

Title (fr)

Margeur de feuilles pour une assembleuse

Publication

EP 1043254 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99810283 A

Priority

EP 99810283 A

Abstract (en)

The driving system has two gears. One, the power input gear (15) has a hollow shaft (23) running in a second hollow shaft (2 which carries a power take-off gear (20) driving the sheet feeder. To synchronize the sheet feed with the collecting chain the relative positions of the gears can be adjusted by a dog (38), carried on a threaded spindle (28), which runs in slots (34,35) i the hollow shafts

Abstract (de)

Der Anleger weist Mittel (9-11) auf, um Bogen (5) einzeln und im Takt von einem Stapel auf eine Fördervorrichtung (2) abzulegen. Ein Getriebe (12) weist ein Eintriebs- (15) und ein mit den genannten Mitteln (9-11) verbundenes Abtriebsrad (20) auf. Mittels einer Verstellvorrichtung (31) sind die beiden genannten Räder (15, 20) zum Verstellen des Ablegetaktes relativ zueinander verdrehbar. Das Abtriebsrad (20) ist auf einer Hohlwelle (24) angeordnet und diese Hohlwelle (24) nimmt eine weitere Welle (23) auf, auf welcher das andere Rad (15) angeordnet ist. Die Erfindung ermöglicht ein schnelles und genaues Anpassen des Taktes des Anlegers (1) an denjenigen der Fördervorrichtung (2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 5/34

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 3/06 (2006.01); B65H 5/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 5/34 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1043254 A1 20001011; JP 2000289871 A 20001017; US 6357738 B1 20020319

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-21 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20031127

2002-11-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021011

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010213

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI