Global Patent Index - EP 1043257 A2

EP 1043257 A2 2000-10-11 - Device for diverting a stream of flat products into different paths

Title (en)

Device for diverting a stream of flat products into different paths

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Umlenken eines Stroms flacher Produkte in verschiedene Richtungen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour dévier un courant de produits plats selon différentes voies

Publication

EP 1043257 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00106009 A

Priority

US 28568599 A

Abstract (en)

A product guide way (1) feeds into first (4) and second (5) product outlet tracks. Upper (6) and lower (7) feeding belt devi include switchable diverting elements (13,22). While turning round an axle these diverting elements form upper and lower diverti levels (19,28) together with outlet conveyor belts (16,23).

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft eine Umlenkvorrichtung für einen kontinuierlichen Produktstrom entlang einer Produktführungsebene (1). Die Produktführungsebene (1) mündet in eine erste Produktaustrittsbahn (4) und eine zweite Produktaustrittsbahn (5). Eine obere Zuführbandanordnung (6) und eine untere Zuführbandanordnung (7) umfassen jeweils aktivierbare Umlenkelemente (13, 22). Bei Drehung der Umlenkelemente (13, 22) um eine jeweilige Achse (16, 25) bilden die Umlenkelemente (13, 22) zusammen mit Austrittsbändern (16, 25) jeweils eine obere und eine untere Umlenkebene (19, 28). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 29/60

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/12 (2006.01); B65H 29/60 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/60 (2013.01); B65H 29/12 (2013.01); B65H 2301/44822 (2013.01); B65H 2404/261 (2013.01); B65H 2404/631 (2013.01); B65H 2701/1932 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1043257 A2 20001011; EP 1043257 A3 20021211; DE 10015167 A1 20001012; JP 2000302310 A 20001031; US 6176485 B1 20010123

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-24 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030718

2003-09-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-04-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030307

2003-01-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20021118

2002-12-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-12-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI