Global Patent Index - EP 1043258 A3

EP 1043258 A3 2001-05-16 - Winding apparatus for continuous threads

Title (en)

Winding apparatus for continuous threads

Title (de)

Aufwindevorrichtung für Endlosfäden

Title (fr)

Bobinoir pour fils textiles continus

Publication

EP 1043258 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 00810187 A

Priority

DE 19915236 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2303646A1] In a winding device for endless yarn with a least one turning centre (6a) for at least one chuck (8, 10), which is being connected with driving devices (80, 83, 67), to these driving devices at least one electrical and one mechanical, in particular a pneumatic control unit (33, 35) is being arranged, which through lines (52, 72) via several rotation transmitters (50, 70), being arranged within the turning centre, are in operational connection with the driving devices. Each rotation transmitter consists of a rotor (53, 73) and a stator (54, 74) which are arranged coaxially in relation to each other and to the turret. Preferably an electric rotation transmitter is being arranged within the turning axis or the turning centre of the turret 6, while a pneumatic rotation transmitter is being arranged in particular for pneumatic lines outside the circumference of a shaft (12) of the turret.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 67/048; B65H 54/52; B65H 54/74

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/74 (2006.01); B65H 67/048 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/74 (2013.01); B65H 67/048 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19915236 A1 20001005; CA 2303646 A1 20001003; CN 1254427 C 20060503; CN 1269320 A 20001011; EP 1043258 A2 20001011; EP 1043258 A3 20010516; EP 1043258 B1 20031112; EP 1043258 B2 20060927; TR 200000867 A2 20001121; TW 491806 B 20020621

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-04-04 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: TRUETZSCHLER SWITZERLAND AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG, WINTERTHUR, CH

- Document: DE 50004392

- Effective date: 20130211

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: MASCHINENFABRIK *RIETER A.G.

- Effective date: 20050331

2006-09-27 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20060927

2006-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE IT LI NL

2005-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051001

2005-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-10-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051001

2005-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: MASCHINENFABRIK *RIETER A.G.

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2004-12-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

2004-10-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20040811

2004-04-01 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040401

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-02-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040224

- Year of fee payment: 5

2004-02-24 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040224

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-12-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50004392 P 20031218

2003-11-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-11-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE IT LI NL

2002-02-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011114

2002-02-13 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE IT LI NL

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE IT LI NL

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI