Global Patent Index - EP 1043259 A2

EP 1043259 A2 2000-10-11 - Self-centring expanding shaft

Title (en)

Self-centring expanding shaft

Title (de)

Selbstzentrierende spreizbare Welle

Title (fr)

Arbre expansible à centrage automatique

Publication

EP 1043259 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 99119660 A

Priority

IT MI990647 A

Abstract (en)

A composite expanding shaft comprising a pneumatic expanding blocking system of a bobbin and a pneumechanic centering system is disclosed, wherein the pneumechanic system comprises at least a movable thrust element operated by a fluid under pressure supplied into an expansion chamber, a first passage way being apt to connect said expansion chamber to an inflation duct of the pneumatic system, and comprising further an obstructing means of said firts passage way, jointly movable with said thrust element of the centering system, apt to keep closed said first passage way for at least a predetermined portion of the thrust element stroke. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 75/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 75/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 75/243 (2013.01); B65H 75/242 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1043259 A2 20001011; EP 1043259 A3 20010523; IT 1312239 B1 20020409; IT MI990647 A1 20000929

INPADOC legal status


2002-09-11 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20020712

2002-04-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-03-06 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE ES FR GB IT

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE LI

2002-01-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011026

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE ES FR GB IT

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI