Global Patent Index - EP 1043260 A1

EP 1043260 A1 2000-10-11 - Procedure for communicating with a transportation system

Title (en)

Procedure for communicating with a transportation system

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Kommunikation mit einem Transportsystem

Title (fr)

Procédé de communication avec un système de transport

Publication

EP 1043260 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00107221 A

Priority

  • EP 00107221 A
  • EP 99810293 A

Abstract (en)

In a man-machine interface (1) a controller (1.1) checks continuously for available non-contact communicating information carriers (1.0). If a user with an information carrier is within receiving range, the controller asks the information carrier to transfer the user's identification data to the controller. By using this data, an individual communication level suited to the u is generated.

Abstract (de)

Bei dieser Mensch-Maschine-Schnittstelle (1) prüft eine Steuereinheit (1.1) permanent das Vorhandensein von berührungslos kommunizierenden Informationsträgern (1.0). Befindet sich ein Benutzer mit einem Informationsträger (1.0) im Empfangsbereich, fordert die Steuereinheit (1.1) den Informationsträger (1.0), mindestens Identifikationsdaten des Benutzers an die Steuereinheit (1.1) zu übertragen. Aufgrund der Daten wird eine individuelle, dem jeweiligen Benutzer angepasste Kommunikationsoberfläche generiert. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 1/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 1/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 1/468 (2013.01); B66B 2201/4615 (2013.01); B66B 2201/463 (2013.01); B66B 2201/4661 (2013.01); B66B 2201/4676 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1043260 A1 20001011; EP 1043260 B1 20041215; EP 1043260 B2 20080806

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160421

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160426

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-08-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: AEN

- Free Format Text: AUFRECHTERHALTUNG DES PATENTES IN GEAENDERTER FORM

2008-08-06 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27A

- Effective date: 20080806

2008-08-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2007-06-13 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY

- Effective date: 20050914

2005-11-09 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: OTIS ELEVATOR COMPANY

- Effective date: 20050914

2005-10-14 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2005-03-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20050302

2005-01-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50008931

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-01-20

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-12-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2004-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-12-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030320

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT CH DE FR GB LI

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010317

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI