Global patent index - EP 1043263 A2

EP 1043263 A2 2000-10-11 - Driving gear for a winch, in particular for a winch of a lifting device

Title (en)

Driving gear for a winch, in particular for a winch of a lifting device

Title (de)

Antrieb für ein Windwerk, insbesondere für ein Hubwerk eines Hebezeugs

Title (fr)

Dispositif d' entrâinement pour un treuil, en particulier pour un treuil d' un appareil de levage

Publication

EP 1043263 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00250108 A

Priority

DE 19916413 A

Abstract (en)

In the housing (1) of the winding mechanism is an electric motor, a gear and a traction roller for winding and unwinding a tractive device connected with a load accommodation device. The traction roller is located on the gear output shaft. The electri motor shaft is connected to the gear input shaft. The housing has the shape of a suitcase and on one of its two flat outer sides (3a) has a suspension (2). On the opposite outer side (4b) is an aperture through which the tractive device (4) is fed. The housing can be carried by person by means of a handgrip. The electric motor, the gear and the traction roller are located in a common plane. The housing i formed by two releasably connected halves (1a,1b) and contains a control unit remotely operable by a receiver unit.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft einen Antrieb für ein Windwerk, insbesondere ein Hubwerk eines Hebezeugs, das ein an einem Tragmittel befestigtes Lastaufnahmemittel aufweist, mit einem Elektromotor, der antriebstechnisch verbunden ist mit einem ein Antriebselement für das Tragmittel antreibenden Getriebe. Um einen Antrieb, insbesondere für ein Hubwerk eines Hebezeugs, für Lasten bis ca. 100 Kg zu schaffen, der kostengünstig herstellbar ist, wird vorgeschlagen, dass der Elektromotor ein nur motorisch und nicht generatorisch betreibbarer Gleich- und/oder Wechselstrommotor und das Getriebe ein selbsthemmendes Schneckengetriebe (7) ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66D 3/22; B66D 1/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66F 17/00 (2006.01); A61G 7/10 (2006.01); B66D 3/22 (2006.01); B66D 3/26 (2006.01); H02K 7/10 (2006.01); H02K 7/104 (2006.01); H02K 49/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61G 7/1042 (2013.01); B60L 7/003 (2013.01); B66D 3/22 (2013.01); B66D 3/26 (2013.01); H02K 2213/09 (2013.01); Y02T 10/641 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6460828 B1 20021008; CN 1269476 A 20001011; DE 19951221 A1 20001005; DE 19952736 A1 20001005; EP 1043263 A2 20001011; EP 1043263 A3 20040714; EP 1043265 A2 20001011; EP 1043265 A3 20071017; JP 2000308307 A 20001102; JP 2000316273 A 20001114; NO 20001676 A 20001002; NO 20001676 D0 20000331; SG 85167 A1 20011219

INPADOC legal status

2005-01-12 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20041117

2004-12-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-10-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20040827

2004-07-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-07-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2004-07-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DEMAG CRANES & COMPONENTS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI