Global Patent Index - EP 1043270 A1

EP 1043270 A1 2000-10-11 - Device for elevating horse head

Title (en)

Device for elevating horse head

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Heben eines Pferdekopfes

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour élever le port de tête d'un cheval

Publication

EP 1043270 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00201252 A

Priority

FI U990166 U

Abstract (en)

Device for elevating the horse's head during harness riding, particularly during trotting, said device being connectable to the harness and comprising a jaw band (4) serving to support the horse's head. According to the present invention the jaw band is connected to a support mechanism (2, 3) which also includes a support arch member (5) adapted above the horse's nose. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B68B 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B68B 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B68B 1/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1043270 A1 20001011; FI 4091 U1 19990831; FI U990166 U0 19990408

INPADOC legal status


2004-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030628

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030217

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT SE

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010409

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI