Global Patent Index - EP 1043357 A1

EP 1043357 A1 2000-10-11 - Rubber compositions

Title (en)

Rubber compositions

Title (de)

Kautschukmischungen

Title (fr)

Compositions de caoutchouc

Publication

EP 1043357 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00106928 A

Priority

DE 19915281 A

Abstract (en)

Rubber mixtures containing organosilanes with one or more alkyl groups and a hydrogen or halogen atom or a thiocyanate, thio polysulfane group attached to silicon via a 1-18C linear or branched alkylidene group. Rubber mixtures containing organosilanes of formula R<1>R<2>R<3>Si-R<4>-Z (I), in which R<1>-R<3> = H, 1-4C alkyl, 1-4C alkoxy or halogen (at least one of these groups being alkyl); R<4> = 1-18C linear or branched alkylidene; Z = H, halogen, SCN, SH or Sx-R<4>-SiR<1>R<2>R<3>; x = 2-10 . Independent claims are also included for (a) processes for the production of filler-containing rubber mixtures by using a organosilane-polysulfane or an organo-silane-polysulfane and an organoalkyl-silane as above; (b) moulded products obtained from these mixtures.

Abstract (de)

Kautschukmischungen, die ein Organosilan der allgemeinen Struktur R<1>R<2>R<3>Si-R<4>-Z (I) enthalten.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C08K 5/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60C 1/00 (2006.01); C08J 5/00 (2006.01); C08K 3/36 (2006.01); C08K 5/54 (2006.01); C08K 5/5419 (2006.01); C08K 5/548 (2006.01); C08L 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C08K 5/548 (2013.01); B60C 1/0016 (2013.01); C08K 5/5406 (2013.01); Y02T 10/862 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C08K 5/548 + C08L 21/00
  2. C08K 5/5406 + C08L 21/00

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19915281 A1 20001005; AT 273344 T 20040815; BR 0001517 A 20001031; CA 2303559 A1 20001003; DE 50007337 D1 20040916; DK 1043357 T3 20041101; EP 1043357 A1 20001011; EP 1043357 B1 20040811; ES 2224947 T3 20050316; JP 2000313773 A 20001114; JP 4615088 B2 20110119; PL 201633 B1 20090430; PL 339404 A1 20001009; PT 1043357 E 20041130; TW 483914 B 20020421; US 6890981 B1 20050510; ZA 200001620 B 20001025

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20160329

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160309

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-03-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2010-03-05 [REG FR CA] CHANGE OF ADDRESS

2010-03-05 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2010-03-05 [REG FR CJ] CHANGE IN LEGAL FORM

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070331

2009-05-20 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: RHODIA CHIMIE

- Effective date: 20050426

2009-05-20 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: DOW CORNING LTD

- Effective date: 20050502

2008-08-06 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: EVONIK DEGUSSA GMBH

2008-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070402

2008-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071001

2007-12-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071001

2007-11-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070331

2007-11-12 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2007-11-07 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: EVONIK DEGUSSA GMBH

2007-05-01 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: DEGUSSA GMBH

- Effective date: 20070221

2007-02-21 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: DEGUSSA GMBH

2006-03-15 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060315

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-03-14 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20060314

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-03-14 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060314

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-09-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: RHODIA CHIMIE

2005-09-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: DOW CORNING LTD

2005-08-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: RHODIA CHIMIE

2005-06-29 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: RHODIA CHIMIE

- Effective date: 20050426

2005-06-29 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: DOW CORNING LTD

- Effective date: 20050502

2005-06-22 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: RHODIA CHIMIE

- Effective date: 20050426

2005-06-15 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: RHODIA CHIMIE

- Effective date: 20050426

2005-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-23 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2005-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2224947 T3

2005-03-14 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20050314

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-02-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-11-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20041008

2004-11-11 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041111

2004-11-11 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20041111

2004-11-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20041020

2004-11-01 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-09-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50007337 P 20040916

2004-09-08 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-08-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-08-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-08-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-08-11 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040811

2004-08-11 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040811

2003-04-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021204

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DEGUSSA AG

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000331

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI