Global Patent Index - EP 1043388 A1

EP 1043388 A1 2000-10-11 - Machine dishwashing tablets containing a granular disintegrant

Title (en)

Machine dishwashing tablets containing a granular disintegrant

Title (de)

Sprengmittelgranulat enthaltende Geschirrspülmaschinenreinigungstabletten

Title (fr)

Comprimés détergents pour le lavage de vaisselle en machine contenant un desintégrant granulaire

Publication

EP 1043388 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99106368 A

Priority

EP 99106368 A

Abstract (en)

A phosphate containing or phosphate-free, 1-3 phase cleaning tablet for use in mechanical dishwashers contains (in addition conventional components) disintegrating agent (I) consisting of a densified granulate comprising (A) water-swellable cellulose; (B) binder(s) selected from (meth)acrylic acid (co)polymers and their salts A phosphate containing or phosphate-free, 1-3 phase cleaning tablet for use in mechanical dishwashers contains (in addition conventional components) 0.5-10 wt. % of disintegrating agent (I) consisting of a densified granulate comprising (A) water-swell cellulose and optionally other modified water-swellable polysaccharide derivatives and (B) binder(s) selected from (meth)acrylic acid (co)polymers and their salts.

Abstract (de)

Geschirrspülmaschinen-Reinigungstablette, enthaltend ein verdichtetes, poröses Sprengmittelgranulat aus in Wasser quellbarer Cellulose und/oder Cellulosederivaten und feinteiligen Polymeren/Copolymeren von (Meth)acrylsäure oder Salzen derselben und ggfs ein oder mehrere flüssige, mit Wasser gelbildende oder verdickende Tenside.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 17/00; C11D 3/22; C11D 3/37

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/22 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 17/0091 (2013.01); C11D 3/222 (2013.01); C11D 3/3761 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 1043388 A1 20001011; EP 1043388 B1 20011219; AT 211164 T 20020115; DE 59900585 D1 20020131; DK 1043388 T3 20020402; ES 2170555 T3 20020801

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170315

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170321

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-31 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20170321

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20170321

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170228

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170321

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-03-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-03-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59900585

- Representative's name: FLEISCHER, ENGELS & PARTNER MBB, PATENTANWAELT, DE

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2170555 T3

2002-04-02 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-03-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900585 20020131

2002-01-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011231

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO JEAN HUNZIKER

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL

2001-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 211164 T 20020115

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000228

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI