Global Patent Index - EP 1043389 A1

EP 1043389 A1 2000-10-11 - Detergent tablets containing a granular disintegrant

Title (en)

Detergent tablets containing a granular disintegrant

Title (de)

Sprengmittelgranulat enthaltende Waschmitteltabletten

Title (fr)

Comprimés détergents contenant un desintégrant granulaire

Publication

EP 1043389 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99106369 A

Priority

EP 99106369 A

Abstract (en)

A detergent and/or cleansing composition is in the form of a pressed article containing fine (co)granulated active agents, builders, auxiliaries, additives and 3-15 wt.% of a densified disintegrant granulate (I) comprising (A) water-insoluble, water-swellable cellulose and (B) binder(s) selected from (meth)acrylic acid (co)polymers and their salts. A detergent and/or cleansing composition is in the form of a pressed article containing fine (co)granulated active agents, builders, auxiliaries, additives and 3-15 wt.% of a densified disintegrant granulate (I) having moisture content 2-8 wt.% and porosity 600-1000 mg/kg and comprising (A) water-insoluble, water-swellable cellulose and optionally other modified water-swella polysaccharide derivatives and (B) binder(s) selected from (meth)acrylic acid (co)polymers and their salts.

Abstract (de)

Wasch- und/oder Reinigungszusammensetzungen in Form gepreßter Körper, enthaltend in relativ feiner Form, als Granulat und/oder Cogranulat übliche wasch- und/oder reinigungsaktive Stoffe, Gerüststoffe, Hilfs- und Zusatzstoffe und 3 bis 15 Gew.%, bezogen auf Gesamtgewicht der Zusammensetzungen, verdichtetes Sprengmittelgranulat aus nichtwasserlöslicher, in Wasser quellbarer Cellulose und/oder nicht wasserlöslichen, in Wasser quellbaren Cellulosederivaten und ein oder mehreren feinteiligen Polymere/Copolymeren von (Meth)acrylsäure oder Salzen derselben, wobei das Sprengmittelgranulat eine Schüttdichte von 100 g/l bis 800 g/l und eine spezifische Porosität von 600 bis 1000 ml/kg aufweist. Die Formkörper sind vorzugsweise phosphathaltige oder phosphatfreie Waschmitteltabletten, Bleichmitteltabletten oder Wasserenthärtungstabletten.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 17/00; C11D 3/22; C11D 3/37

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/22 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/222 (2013.01); C11D 3/3761 (2013.01); C11D 17/0073 (2013.01); C11D 17/0078 (2013.01); C11D 17/0086 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1043389 A1 20001011; EP 1043389 B1 20010530; AT 201714 T 20010615; DE 59900108 D1 20010705; DK 1043389 T3 20010903; ES 2159442 T3 20011001

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070319

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-02 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070419

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070614

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-12-03 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20070530

2007-10-17 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20070530

2007-10-17 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20070530

2007-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-03-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070329

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-03-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070322

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-03-14 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070314

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-03-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070313

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-03-13 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20070313

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-03-13 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20070313

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-03-13 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070313

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-03-13 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070313

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-12-12 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061212

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-08-02 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: DALLI-WERKE GMBH & CO. KG

2004-05-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: DALLI-WERKE GMBH & CO. KG

2002-02-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: HENKEL KGAA

2001-10-24 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HENKEL KGAA

- Effective date: 20010903

2001-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2159442 T3

2001-09-03 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-07-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2001-07-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-07-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MARIETTI E GISLON S.R.L.

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900108 20010705

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2001-06-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO JEAN HUNZIKER * PATENTANWALTSBU

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201714 T 20010615

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000228

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI