Global Patent Index - EP 1043389 B1

EP 1043389 B1 2001-05-30 - Detergent tablets containing a granular disintegrant

Title (en)

Detergent tablets containing a granular disintegrant

Title (de)

Sprengmittelgranulat enthaltende Waschmitteltabletten

Title (fr)

Comprimés détergents contenant un desintégrant granulaire

Publication

EP 1043389 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99106369 A

Priority

EP 99106369 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1043389A1] A detergent and/or cleansing composition is in the form of a pressed article containing fine (co)granulated active agents, builders, auxiliaries, additives and 3-15 wt.% of a densified disintegrant granulate (I) comprising (A) water-insoluble, water-swellable cellulose and (B) binder(s) selected from (meth)acrylic acid (co)polymers and their salts. A detergent and/or cleansing composition is in the form of a pressed article containing fine (co)granulated active agents, builders, auxiliaries, additives and 3-15 wt.% of a densified disintegrant granulate (I) having moisture content 2-8 wt.% and porosity 600-1000 mg/kg and comprising (A) water-insoluble, water-swellable cellulose and optionally other modified water-swella polysaccharide derivatives and (B) binder(s) selected from (meth)acrylic acid (co)polymers and their salts.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 17/00; C11D 3/22; C11D 3/37

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/22 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/222 (2013.01); C11D 3/3761 (2013.01); C11D 17/0073 (2013.01); C11D 17/0078 (2013.01); C11D 17/0086 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1043389 A1 20001011; EP 1043389 B1 20010530; AT 201714 T 20010615; DE 59900108 D1 20010705; DK 1043389 T3 20010903; ES 2159442 T3 20011001

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070319

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-02 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070419

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070614

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-12-03 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20070530

2007-10-17 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20070530

2007-10-17 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20070530

2007-10-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-03-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070329

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-03-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070322

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-03-14 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070314

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-03-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070313

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-03-13 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20070313

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-03-13 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20070313

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-03-13 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20070313

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-03-13 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20070313

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-12-12 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20061212

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-08-02 [NLT2] NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN

- Owner name: DALLI-WERKE GMBH & CO. KG

2004-05-19 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: DALLI-WERKE GMBH & CO. KG

2002-02-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-03 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: HENKEL KGAA

2001-10-24 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: HENKEL KGAA

- Effective date: 20010903

2001-10-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2159442 T3

2001-09-03 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-07-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2001-07-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-07-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MARIETTI E GISLON S.R.L.

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900108 20010705

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2001-06-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010530

2001-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO JEAN HUNZIKER * PATENTANWALTSBU

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE

2001-05-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-05-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201714 T 20010615

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000228

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI