Global Patent Index - EP 1043391 A1

EP 1043391 A1 2000-10-11 - High density disintegrating granulate for tablets; method for making it and its use

Title (en)

High density disintegrating granulate for tablets; method for making it and its use

Title (de)

Verdichtetes Sprengmittelgranulat für gepresste Formkörper; dessen Herstellung und Verwendung

Title (fr)

Désintégrant granulaire de haute densité pour comprimé; méthode de préparation et son utilisation

Publication

EP 1043391 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99106370 A

Priority

EP 99106370 A

Abstract (en)

In a densified disintegrant granulate for tablets, comprising (A) 60-99 wt.% water-insoluble, water-swellable cellulose and optionally other modified water-swellable polysaccharide derivatives, (B) 1-40 wt.% binder(s) selected from (meth)acrylic acid (co)polymers and their salts and (C) 0-7 wt. % liquid surfactant(s) forming a gel with water, the granulate has a moisture conte of 2-8 wt.%. Independent claims are also included for: (i) an alternative form of the disintegrant granules (also having moisture conten 2-8 wt.%), comprising (A) as above and 1-40 wt.% of at least one polymeric binder/surfactant; and (ii) the preparation of either for the granulate by forming a pre-mix of the components to be granulated then densifying the premix, where the premix is adjusted t moisture content of 10-80 wt.%, followed by drying to a moisture content of 2-8 wt.% after compacting and optionally obtaining t required granule size distribution by milling and screening.

Abstract (de)

Verdichtetes Granulat aus in Wasser quellbarer Cellulose und Cellulose- bzw. Stärkederivaten, Polymeren/Copolymeren von (Meth)acrylsäure oder Salzen derselben und gegebenefalls ein oder mehreren flüssigen Tensiden mit einem Wassergehalt von 2 bis 8 Gew.% im Granulat und dessen Verwendung als Sprengmittel für Waschmitteltabletten, Reinigungsmitteltabletten, Wasserenthärtungstabletten und Fleckensalztabletten, sowie ein Verfahren zum Herstellen des verdichteten Granulats durch Mischen der Bestandteile, Granulieren und Verdichten.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 17/06; C11D 3/22; C11D 3/37; C11D 7/44; C11D 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/22 (2006.01); C11D 3/37 (2006.01); C11D 7/44 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01); C11D 17/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/3761 (2013.01); C11D 3/222 (2013.01); C11D 17/0073 (2013.01); C11D 17/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1043391 A1 20001011; EP 1043391 B1 20060726; AT 334187 T 20060815; CZ 20001116 A3 20030312; CZ 293387 B6 20040414; DE 59913705 D1 20060907; ES 2270547 T3 20070401; HU 0001329 A2 20010228; HU 0001329 A3 20020729; HU 228596 B1 20130429; PL 196418 B1 20071231; PL 339271 A1 20001009; PT 1043391 E 20061229; TR 200000832 A2 20001023; TR 200000832 A3 20001023; US 6303560 B1 20011016

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20170321

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20170314

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170228

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20160328

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160309

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-03-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59913705

- Representative's name: FLEISCHER, ENGELS & PARTNER MBB, PATENTANWAELT, DE

2009-08-31 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060726

2009-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070329

2008-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070331

2008-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070331

2008-01-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070331

2007-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-07-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070427

2007-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2270547 T3

2007-02-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-01-25 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20060726

2006-12-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20061024

2006-11-23 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20060403602

2006-11-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20061027

2006-10-26 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061026

2006-10-26 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061026

2006-09-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59913705 P 20060907

2006-08-23 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2006-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2006-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-07-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2006-07-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2006-07-26 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060726

2006-07-26 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060726

2006-07-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060726

2005-06-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050506

2004-05-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DALLI-WERKE GMBH & CO. KG

2003-04-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DALLI-WERKEWAESCHE-UND KOERPERPFLEGE GMBH & CO.K

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-06-27 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20010411;LT PAYMENT 20010411;LV PAYMENT 20010411;MK PAYMENT 20010411;RO PAYMENT 20010411;SI PAYMENT 20010411

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000121

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI