Global patent index - EP 1043409 A2

EP 1043409 A2 2000-10-11 - Composite material prepared by powder metallurgy

Title (en)

Composite material prepared by powder metallurgy

Title (de)

Pulvermetallurgisch hergestellter Verbundwerkstoff und Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung

Title (fr)

Matériau composite préparé par métallurgie des poudres

Publication

EP 1043409 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00107121 A

Priority

DE 19916082 A

Abstract (en)

A powder metallurgically formed laminar material, comprises a matrix composed of silver, which holds at least one granular refractory metal additive. The refractory component has a maximum mean granular size of 2 mu m, and is uniformly distributed wit the matrix. The laminar material has a residual porosity of less than 0.5%.

Abstract (de)

Gegenstand der Erfindung ist ein pulvermetallurgisch hergestellter Verbundwerkstoff, umfassend eine Matrix aus einem Metall mit einem Schmelzpunkt von höchstens 1100°C und einen in dieser Matrix enthaltenen körnigen Zusatz aus mindestens einem feinkörnigen Refraktärmetall mit einer durchschnittlichen Korngröße von höchstens 2 µm, das in der Matrix gleichmäßig verteilt ist, sodaß der Verbund eine Restporosität von < 0,5 % aufweist. Ferner betrifft die Erfindung ein Verfahren zur Herstellung des Verbundwerkstoffes und seine Verwendung als elektrischer Kontaktwerkstoff. <IMAGE>

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 1/04 (2006.01); B22F 1/00 (2006.01); B22F 3/14 (2006.01); B22F 3/20 (2006.01); B22F 3/24 (2006.01); B22F 7/00 (2006.01); C22C 5/06 (2006.01); C22C 27/04 (2006.01); H01H 1/021 (2006.01); H01H 1/023 (2006.01); H01H 1/025 (2006.01); H01H 11/04 (2006.01); H01H 33/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 1/023 (2013.01); B22F 1/0003 (2013.01); B22F 2998/10 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B22F 2998/10 + B22F 3/17 + B22F 3/18 + B22F 3/20
  2. B22F 2998/10 + B22F 1/0003 + B22F 3/02 + B22F 3/10

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1043409 A2 20001011; EP 1043409 A3 20031217; EP 1043409 B1 20080618; DE 19916082 A1 20001019; DE 19916082 C2 20010510; DE 50015204 D1 20080731; ES 2307476 T3 20081201; JP 2000319734 A 20001121; US 6312495 B1 20011106

INPADOC legal status

2014-03-06 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50015204

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20131101

2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20131101

2012-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120531

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090407

2010-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090408

2010-06-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20090408

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091222

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090407

2010-01-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20091231

2009-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090407

2009-05-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20090319

2008-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2307476

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2008-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50015204

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2008-07-31

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2008-06-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2008-06-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-10-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040902

2004-09-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-06-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20040506

2003-12-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-12-17 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Extension state: AL LT LV MK RO SI

2003-12-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7C 22C 1/04 A

2003-12-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7B 22F 1/00 B

2003-12-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7H 01H 1/02 B

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI