Global patent index - EP 1043429 A1

EP 1043429 A1 2000-10-11 - Method for the production of a stranded fibre composite from glass fibres and fibre composite from glass fibres

Title (en)

Method for the production of a stranded fibre composite from glass fibres and fibre composite from glass fibres

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Herstellen eines strangartigen Faserverbundes aus Glasfasern und Glasfaserfaserverbund

Title (fr)

Procédé pour la production d'un composite à base de fibres de verre et composite de fibres à base de fibres de verre

Publication

EP 1043429 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00106778 A

Priority

DE 19915955 A

Abstract (en)

The appts. to produce strands of bundled glass fibers, and at least one additional material, has a feed (15) with a second f path (22), separate from the first feed path, through the peripheral wall of the spinning funnel (10). The two feed paths pass through the feed opening (11), separated from each other by a dividing wall. The second feed path h channel (22) which passes through the feed opening (11) or is connected to it, and it has its own air supply (20) with a variabl air stream. The feed (15) has an opening unit (18,19) which is exposed to the air stream at the second feed path (22). The first feed path is closer to the outer wall (12) of the spinning funnel (10) than the second feed path (22). An Independent claim is included for the prodn. of bundled strands of glass fibers, where the additional material is fed into the spinning funnel separa from the glass. Preferred Features: The additional material passes into the spinning funnel through the same feed opening as the first feed path, but separated from it. The additional material, and especially plastics fibers, is in a homogenous mix through cross section of the hybrid fibers. The glass and the plastics fibers are aligned along the line of the hybrid fibers. The ratio the glass fibers to the additional fibers is 10:90 to 99:1 and pref. 10:90 to 90:10. The glass fibers are of C-glass and/or E-gl with a dia. of 2-25 mu m and pref. 7-17 mu m. The glass and the plastics fibers are in staple fiber form. The additional fibers a length of 10 mm and pref. 40-80 mm. The hybrid fiber material has a titer of 20-5000 tex and pref. up to 2000 tex.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Vorrichtung und ein Verfahren zum Herstellen eines strangartigen Faserverbundes (14) aus Glasfasern (4) und mindestens einem Zusatzmaterial (16) angegeben mit einer rotierenden Ziehfläche (6), einer Abhebeeinrichtung (9), einem Spinntrichter (10), der in seiner Umfangswand eine längliche Zuführöffnung (11) mit einem ersten Speisepfad für Glasfasern und an einer Stirnseite eine Abzugsöffnung aufweist, mit einer Abzugseinrichtung (26) und mit einer Speiseeinrichtung (15) für das Zusatzmaterial. Hierbei möchte man den Faserverbund homogen mischen können. Hierzu weist die Speiseeinrichtung (15) einen zweiten Speisepfad (22) auf, der getrennt vom ersten Speisepfad durch die Umfangswand des Spinntrichters (10) verläuft. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01G 13/00; D02G 3/04; D02G 3/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C03B 37/12 (2006.01); D01G 13/00 (2006.01); D02G 3/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D02G 3/18 (2013.01); D01G 13/00 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2913 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2927 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2929 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2967 (2013.01); Y10T 428/298 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1043429 A1 20001011; EP 1043429 B1 20040218; AT 259897 T 20040315; CA 2303745 A1 20001009; CA 2303745 C 20080617; CZ 20001282 A3 20010411; CZ 300597 B6 20090624; DE 19915955 A1 20001019; DE 19915955 C2 20010913; DK 1043429 T3 20040517; ES 2215511 T3 20041016; PL 193380 B1 20070228; PL 339108 A1 20001023; US 2001009719 A1 20010726; US 2001010862 A1 20010802; US 6254816 B1 20010703; US 6438935 B2 20020827; US 6440558 B2 20020827

INPADOC legal status

2016-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20160330

2016-11-16 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM

- Effective date: 20160401

2016-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 50005291

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2016-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2015-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150327

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150317

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150327

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150326

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150327

- Year of fee payment: 16

2015-03-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070330

2008-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070331

2008-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20070331

2008-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070402

2008-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070331

2008-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070331

2008-01-02 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040718

2007-11-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070330

2007-11-20 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2007-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2007-11-12 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2007-03-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070331

2006-03-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-03-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060330

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-03-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060329

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-03-03 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060303

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-04-13 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050413

- Year of fee payment: 6

2005-02-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041119

2004-11-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2215511

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2004-09-22 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2004-06-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040507

2004-05-18 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040518

2004-05-17 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2004-04-27 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2004-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040330

2004-03-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50005291

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-03-25

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-03-24 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2004-02-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-02-27 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: LUCHS & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE

2004-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-02-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-02-18 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040218

2004-02-18 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040218

2004-02-18 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040218

2003-11-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: JOHNS MANVILLE EUROPE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-09-03 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: DEVICE FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A STRANDED FIBRE COMPOSITE FROM GLASS FIBRES AND FIBRE COMPOSITE FROM GLASS FIBRES

2003-08-27 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF A STRANDED FIBRE COMPOSITE FROM GLASS FIBRES AND FIBRE COMPOSITE FROM GLASS FIBRES

2002-09-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020802

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010131

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI