Global patent index - EP 1043430 A2

EP 1043430 A2 2000-10-11 - Apparatus for driving detaching rollers of a combing machine

Title (en)

Apparatus for driving detaching rollers of a combing machine

Title (de)

Antriebsvorrichtung für die Abreisszylinder einer Kämmmaschine

Title (fr)

Appareil d'entrainement de cylindres arracheurs d'une machine de peignage

Publication

EP 1043430 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00810180 A

Priority

CH 61299 A

Abstract (en)

In the drive system for the detaching rollers, at a comber, the ratio between the gap of the linkage point (D) of the pull r (10) at the eccentric (8) and its rotary axis (B) to the gap between the center (C) of the rocker (11) and the rotary axis (B) o the eccentric (8) is 3.5. The ratio between the two gaps is pref. 4-5. The connecting line between the linkage point (G) of the coupling (16) at the rocker (11) and from the center (C) of the rocker (11) to the linkage point (J) of the support lever (14) at the rocker (11) forms an included angle of 18 degrees and pref. 20-35 degrees .

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf eine Antriebsvorrichtung für Abreisswalzen (23) an einer Kämmaschine mit einem Differentialgetriebe (21), dessen eine Eingangswelle mit einem der Eingangswelle eine gleichförmige Drehbewegung erteilenden Antrieb und dessen andere Eingangswelle mit einer eine zusätzliche Drehbewegung erteilenden Steuervorrichtung verbunden ist, mit einem am Gestell gelagerten Exzenter (8), der über eine Zugstange (10) mit einer dem Exzenter eine ungleichförmige Drehbewegung konstanter Antriebsdrehzahl erteilenden und gegenüber dem Exzenterdrehpunkt (B) versetzt gelagerten Kurbel (A,E) verbunden ist, wobei der Exzenter (8) eine an einem Umfangspunkt (J) über einen drehbar am Gestell gelagerten Stützhebel (14) gelenkig abgestützte Schwinge (11) trägt, welche zur Übertragung einer ihr vom Exzenter erteilten Bewegung über eine Koppel (16) mit einem Steuerhebel (17) der genannten anderen Eingangswelle (20) für die zusätzliche Drehbewegung verbunden ist. Mit der bekannten Anordnung war eine Grenze erreicht, wobei die Erhöhung der Kammspielzahlen nicht ohne Probleme möglich war. Auf der Basis der bekannten Ausführung zur Erhöhung der Kammspielzahlen wird deshalb eine spezielle Ausführung vorgeschlagen, wobei das Verhältnis zwischen dem Abstand des Anlenkpunktes (D) der Zugstange (10) am Exzenter (8) zu dessen Drehpunkt (B) zum Abstand zwischen der Mitte (C) der Schwinge (11) und dem Drehpunkt (B) des Exzenters (8) grösser als 3,5 gewählt ist. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01G 19/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01G 19/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01G 19/26 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 1043430 A2 20001011; EP 1043430 A3 20010221; EP 1043430 B1 20040225; CN 1179075 C 20041208; CN 1270241 A 20001018; DE 50005372 D1 20040401

INPADOC legal status

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090302

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080321

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080325

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070331

2008-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070331

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070614

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2007-03-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070316

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-03-15 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060315

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20041126

2004-04-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 50005372

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-04-01

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-02-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2004-02-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2003-04-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030226

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE IT LI

2001-10-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010820

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI