Global Patent Index - EP 1043432 A1

EP 1043432 A1 2000-10-11 - Method and apparatus for condensing a sliver stretched in a drawing mechanism for spinning machines

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for condensing a sliver stretched in a drawing mechanism for spinning machines

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Bündeln eines in einem Streckwerk einer Spinnereimaschine verzogenen Faserverbandes

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour comprimer un ruban de fibres etiré dans un mécanisme d'étirage pour métiers à filer

Publication

EP 1043432 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00106292 A

Priority

DE 19914201 A

Abstract (en)

After drawing in a drafting system (1), sliver (2) is condensed by suction on a perforated apron (15). The suction opening ( is placed at an angle to the transport direction and gathers fibers over the full perforated width (B). An Independent claim is also included for a drafting system (1) with a pneumatic condensing section (30) containing a sucti opening (20) with its edge (K) at an angle to the direction of motion of the apron (15). The suction slot can be curved or can b two parts, giving a V-shape.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung bezieht sich auf ein Verfahren und eine Vorrichtung zum Bündeln eines in einem Streckwerk 1 einer Spinnereimaschine verzogenen Faserverbandes 2, der im Anschluss an den Verzug in einer Faserbündelungszone 3 zusammengefasst und zu einem Faden zusammengedreht wird, wobei der ein Ausgangswalzenpaar 10 des Streckwerks 1 verlassende Faserverband 2 über die Länge der Faserbündelungszone 3 einem quer zur Transportrichtung gerichteten Saugluftstrom ausgesetzt und während des Zusammenfassens durch ein im Wesentlichen ebenes, perforiertes Transportmittel 15 einseitig unterstützt wird. Der Saugluftstrom wirkt etwa in der Breite des gewünschten Zusammenfassens durch mindestens eine Saugöffnung 20 und durch das Transportmittel hindurch auf den Faserverband. Erfindungsgemäß werden die Fasern des Faserverbandes 2 im Bereich der Saugöffnung 20 zumindest teilweise schräg zur Transportrichtung bewegt, zusammenengefasst und verdichtet. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 5/72; D01H 5/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 5/26 (2006.01); D01H 5/66 (2006.01); D01H 5/72 (2006.01); D01H 5/86 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 5/26 (2013.01); D01H 5/72 (2013.01); D01H 5/86 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19914201 A1 20001005; EP 1043432 A1 20001011; JP 2000290840 A 20001017; US 6263655 B1 20010724

INPADOC legal status


2002-02-13 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20011215

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011119

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE IT LI

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001026

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI