Global Patent Index - EP 1043436 A1

EP 1043436 A1 2000-10-11 - Low weight terry knitwear

Title (en)

Low weight terry knitwear

Title (de)

Leichtgewicht-Schlingengewirk

Title (fr)

Tissu tricoté à boucles de faible grammage

Publication

EP 1043436 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400844 A

Priority

FR 9903954 A

Abstract (en)

The loop knit lightweight fabric has a base of warps or wales of stitches (8,9) to form a network of wales parallel to each other, held together by wefts (6). The loops (14), knitted into the base material, each have two feet (12,13) knitted into the b material and their legs form the loops. The bond between the wefts (6) and the wales (8,9) is formed by initially knitting a sti of a leading wale (11) following a bonding weft, and then a second stitch (7) at a second wale (8) following a bonding stitch. T there is a third stitch (15) of a third wale following a second weft, and a fourth stitch (9) of a fourth wale (8) following a bonding stitch and a fifth stitch (10) which matches the first stitch of a cycle which follows a weft insertion. The second and fourth wales are part of the network forming the base fabric, between the first and third wales. The two feet of a loop are knit into the second and fourth stitches respectively. Each wale of stitches is formed by a cycle of four stitches. They are formed alternately where two stitches are moved by th needles in a right/left or left/right direction, while the other two stitches are moved in the opposite directions. The second ( and fourth (9) stitches are at the same wale, where the second and fourth wales form the same single wale (8), separated from ea other by a stitch which corresponds to a first (10) and third (15) stitch in the weft cycle. Each loop (14) has a foot (12) knit into a second stitch with a needle bar movement to the peak of cast-off, where the needle is between two of the consecutive thir stitches at a min. gap between the wales of third stitches. The other foot (13) of the loop is knitted into a fourth stitch at t other side, similar to the first. The knitting and weft yarns have a thickness of 1-60 dtex, and pref. 12-45 dtex, such as wefts 22 dtex and knitting yarns of 12 dtex. The loop yarns have a thickness of 30-60 dtex, such as 44 dtex.

Abstract (fr)

Tissu tricoté à boucles, comportant : un fond constitué de fils chaînette, ou colonne (8, 11) de mailles formant un réseau de colonnes parallèles les unes des autres, et de fils de liaison trame, ou fils (6) de trame, qui viennent se lier aux fils de chaînette pour former le fond, et des boucles (14) tricotées dans le fond constituées chacune de deux pieds (12, 13) tricotés dans le fond et de deux brins partant des pieds et d'un sommet de liaison des deux brins, la liaison entre les fils (6) de trame et les colonnes (8, 11) de mailles est réalisée de sorte que chaque fil (6) de trame est d'abord tricoté dans une première maille d'une première colonne (11) de mailles suivant une liaison trame, puis est tricotée dans une deuxième maille (7) d'une deuxième colonne (8) de mailles suivant une liaison maille, puis de nouveau dans une troisième maille (15) d'une troisième colonne de mailles suivant une seconde liaison trame, puis dans une quatrième maille (9) d'une quatrième colonne (8) de mailles suivant une liaison maille puis enfin dans une cinquième maille (10) qui correspond à la première maille d'un cycle suivant, suivant une nouvelle liaison trame, la deuxième colonne et la quatrième colonne se trouvant, dans le réseau de colonnes, entre la première colonne et la troisième colonne et les deux pieds d'une boucle étant tricotés dans les deuxième et quatrième mailles respectivement. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 21/02; A44B 18/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61F 13/66 (2006.01); A44B 18/00 (2006.01); D03D 25/00 (2006.01); D03D 27/00 (2006.01); D04B 21/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44B 18/0034 (2013.01); D04B 21/02 (2013.01); D10B 2501/0632 (2013.01); Y10T 24/2733 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1043436 A1 20001011; EP 1043436 B1 20030604; DE 60003113 D1 20030710; DE 60003113 T2 20040415; ES 2199745 T3 20040301; FR 2791707 A1 20001006; FR 2791707 B1 20010525; JP 2000303330 A 20001031; US 6196031 B1 20010306

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090328

2010-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090330

2010-05-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090330

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091123

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090328

2010-02-26 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-12-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090328

2009-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *APLIX

- Effective date: 20090331

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080329

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080411

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080529

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080226

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080327

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080326

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2199745 T3

2003-09-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60003113 P 20030710

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES FR GB IT

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001218

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI