Global Patent Index - EP 1043436 B1

EP 1043436 B1 2003-06-04 - Low weight terry knitwear

Title (en)

Low weight terry knitwear

Title (de)

Leichtgewicht-Schlingengewirk

Title (fr)

Tissu tricoté à boucles de faible grammage

Publication

EP 1043436 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 00400844 A

Priority

FR 9903954 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP1043436A1] The loop knit lightweight fabric has a base of warps or wales of stitches (8,9) to form a network of wales parallel to each other, held together by wefts (6). The loops (14), knitted into the base material, each have two feet (12,13) knitted into the b material and their legs form the loops. The bond between the wefts (6) and the wales (8,9) is formed by initially knitting a sti of a leading wale (11) following a bonding weft, and then a second stitch (7) at a second wale (8) following a bonding stitch. T there is a third stitch (15) of a third wale following a second weft, and a fourth stitch (9) of a fourth wale (8) following a bonding stitch and a fifth stitch (10) which matches the first stitch of a cycle which follows a weft insertion. The second and fourth wales are part of the network forming the base fabric, between the first and third wales. The two feet of a loop are knit into the second and fourth stitches respectively. Each wale of stitches is formed by a cycle of four stitches. They are formed alternately where two stitches are moved by th needles in a right/left or left/right direction, while the other two stitches are moved in the opposite directions. The second ( and fourth (9) stitches are at the same wale, where the second and fourth wales form the same single wale (8), separated from ea other by a stitch which corresponds to a first (10) and third (15) stitch in the weft cycle. Each loop (14) has a foot (12) knit into a second stitch with a needle bar movement to the peak of cast-off, where the needle is between two of the consecutive thir stitches at a min. gap between the wales of third stitches. The other foot (13) of the loop is knitted into a fourth stitch at t other side, similar to the first. The knitting and weft yarns have a thickness of 1-60 dtex, and pref. 12-45 dtex, such as wefts 22 dtex and knitting yarns of 12 dtex. The loop yarns have a thickness of 30-60 dtex, such as 44 dtex.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D04B 21/02; A44B 18/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61F 13/66 (2006.01); A44B 18/00 (2006.01); D03D 25/00 (2006.01); D03D 27/00 (2006.01); D04B 21/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44B 18/0034 (2013.01); D04B 21/02 (2013.01); D10B 2501/0632 (2013.01); Y10T 24/2733 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1043436 A1 20001011; EP 1043436 B1 20030604; DE 60003113 D1 20030710; DE 60003113 T2 20040415; ES 2199745 T3 20040301; FR 2791707 A1 20001006; FR 2791707 B1 20010525; JP 2000303330 A 20001031; US 6196031 B1 20010306

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090328

2010-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090330

2010-05-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090330

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091123

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090328

2010-02-26 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-12-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090328

2009-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. *APLIX

- Effective date: 20090331

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080329

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20080411

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080529

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080226

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080327

- Year of fee payment: 9

2008-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080326

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2199745 T3

2003-09-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60003113 P 20030710

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE DE ES FR GB IT

2001-02-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001218

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI