Global Patent Index - EP 1043442 A2

EP 1043442 A2 2000-10-11 - Electric iron with improved stability

Title (en)

Electric iron with improved stability

Title (de)

Elektrisches Bügeleisen mit verbesserter Stabilität

Title (fr)

Fer à repasser électrique à stabilité amélliorée

Publication

EP 1043442 A2 (FR)

Application

EP 00400887 A

Priority

FR 9904502 A

Abstract (en)

Back resting points (10, 11, 12) or feet of this iron, define a plane. Around them, a ring (18) is seen to be elliptical and displaced slightly towards the front of the iron. This forms a second plane. The extent of the first plane lies within that of t second.

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un fer à repasser électrique comportant un corps (2) qui présente un élément chauffant disposé dans sa partie inférieure (4), un organe d'appui (6) situé sur la partie arrière (9) du corps (2) définissant une première surface (S1) ; et, fixée sous le corps (2), une semelle plane (13) dont la face supérieure (14) est en contact thermique avec l'élément chauffant et la face inférieure (15) constitue la surface de repassage. Selon l'invention, le fer à repasser (1) comporte un organe de stabilisation (18) définissant une seconde surface (S2) sensiblement parallèle à la première, telle que les limites de la première surface (S1) sont inscrites dans les limites de la seconde surface (S2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06F 75/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 75/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 75/40 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1043442 A2 20001011; EP 1043442 A3 20020102; FR 2791710 A1 20001006

INPADOC legal status


2002-11-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-10-23 [D17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (DELETED)

2002-10-23 [DBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (DELETED)

2002-09-18 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20020625

2002-09-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB IT

2002-09-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020702

2002-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI