Global Patent Index - EP 1043445 A2

EP 1043445 A2 2000-10-11 - Process for marking textile products

Title (en)

Process for marking textile products

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Markieren von Textilerzeugnissen

Title (fr)

Procédé de marquage de produits textiles

Publication

EP 1043445 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 00106862 A

Priority

DE 19915897 A

Abstract (en)

A process for marking a textile product comprises using an invisible substance which can be detected using an analytical chemistry technique. The substance can be picked up and detected using a suction probe. The substance is detected using a dye reaction.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zum Markieren eines Textilerzeugnisses. Dieses kann, insbesondere im verarbeiteten Zustand, nicht oder nur mit großem Aufwand identifiziert werden, so daß Nachahmungen durch andere Hersteller möglich sind mit entsprechenden Verlusten für die Produzenten. Dieses Problem wird gemäß der Erfindung dadurch gelöst, daß das Textilerzeugnis mit einer visuell nicht feststellbaren Markierung versehen wird, welche nur mit einer entsprechenden Sonde nachweisbar ist.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06P 1/00; D06H 1/00; D06P 5/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06H 1/00 (2006.01); D06P 1/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06P 1/004 (2013.01); D06H 1/00 (2013.01); Y10S 428/916 (2013.01); Y10T 436/13 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1043445 A2 20001011; EP 1043445 A3 20020102; DE 19915897 A1 20001019; US 6524859 B1 20030225

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-02 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Effective date: 20030206

2002-10-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020819

2002-09-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-08-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20020620

2002-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-01-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI